Exegy Incorporated et al v. Activ Financial Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: IP Reservoir, LLC and Exegy Incorporated
Defendant: Activ Financial Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02858
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Exegy Incorporated, IP Reservoir, LLC by J Bradley Luchsinger (Luchsinger, J Bradley)
June 19, 2019 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Exegy Incorporated, IP Reservoir, LLC by Glenn E. Forbis (Forbis, Glenn)
June 19, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Exegy Incorporated, IP Reservoir, LLC by Michael J Thomas (Thomas, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Exegy Incorporated, IP Reservoir, LLC by Matthew L Cutler (Cutler, Matthew)
June 18, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #16 , #17 , #18 , #19 , #20 are granted. No appearance on those motions is required. Counsel are directed to file their appearances. Defendant's unopposed motion to extend time to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint #23 is granted. No appearance on that motion is required. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading is now due on 7/19/19. The initial status conference that was scheduled for 7/16/19 is stricken and reset for 8/7/19 at 9:00 a.m. The initial status report is now due on 7/31/19. Mailed notice (air, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Motion by Eric D Hayes for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #23 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 6/20/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Hayes, Eric)
June 17, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendant Activ Financial Systems, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and to Reset Date of Initial Status Conference and Related Deadlines (Hayes, Eric)
June 17, 2019 Filing 22 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Activ Financial Systems, Inc. (Hayes, Eric)
June 17, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Activ Financial Systems, Inc. by Eric D Hayes (Hayes, Eric)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15933700. (Corbett, Gregory)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15933653. (Schuster, Claire)
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15933621. (Greene, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15933548. (DiMarco, Elizabeth)
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15933498. (Steenburg, Charles)
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Activ Financial Systems, Inc. by Stephen C. Voris (Voris, Stephen)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:This case is set for an initial status conference on 7/16/19 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 7/9/19. Mailed notice (air, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 are granted. No appearance on those motions is required. Counsel are directed to file their appearances. Mailed notice (air, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Exegy Incorporated, IP Reservoir, LLC regarding Summons and Complaint served on Activ Financial Systems, Inc on 05/30/2019 (Cutler, Matthew)
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15876239. (Forbis, Glenn)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15876042. (Luchsinger, J Bradley)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15875880. (Thomas, Michael)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15875830. (Cutler, Matthew)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (Attachments: #1 Patent Registration) (kp, )
April 29, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Activ Financial Systems, Inc. (ec, )
April 29, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Exegy Incorporated, IP Reservoir, LLC by Daniel J. Burnham (Burnham, Daniel)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Exegy Incorporated, IP Reservoir, LLC re complaint,,, #1 Of Claims Involving Patents Pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 (Tilghman, Richard)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Exegy Incorporated, IP Reservoir, LLC (Tilghman, Richard)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Exegy Incorporated, IP Reservoir, LLC by Richard Henry Tilghman (Tilghman, Richard)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Tilghman, Richard)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed by Exegy Incorporated, IP Reservoir, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15768181. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35)(Tilghman, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Exegy Incorporated et al v. Activ Financial Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Activ Financial Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory F. Corbett
Represented By: Eric D Hayes
Represented By: Elizabeth A. DiMarco
Represented By: Claire E. Schuster
Represented By: Charles T Steenburg
Represented By: Michael A. Greene
Represented By: Stephen C. Voris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IP Reservoir, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Burnham
Represented By: Richard Henry Tilghman
Represented By: Glenn E. Forbis
Represented By: J Bradley Luchsinger
Represented By: Michael J Thomas
Represented By: Matthew L Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exegy Incorporated
Represented By: Daniel J. Burnham
Represented By: Richard Henry Tilghman
Represented By: J Bradley Luchsinger
Represented By: Michael J Thomas
Represented By: Glenn E. Forbis
Represented By: Matthew L Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?