Cohan v. Pacific Tai, LLC

Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Defendant: Pacific Tai, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02870
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #8 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, June 21, 2019. An Agreed Written Status Report is due on 8/21/2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Sean C. Herring for presentment of extension of time #8 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 6/14/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Herring, Sean)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Pacific Tai, LLC for extension of time DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD (Herring, Sean)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pacific Tai, LLC by Sean C. Herring (Herring, Sean)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pacific Tai, LLC by Julia Sarah Wolf (Wolf, Julia)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pacific Tai, LLC by Kirsten Ann Milton (Milton, Kirsten)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Howard Cohan as to Pacific Tai, LLC on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. (Burt, Marshall)
April 30, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Pacific Tai, LLC (mc, )
April 30, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Howard Cohan by Marshall J. Burt (Burt, Marshall)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Burt, Marshall)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Howard Cohan; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15770155.(Burt, Marshall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohan v. Pacific Tai, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Represented By: Marshall J. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Tai, LLC
Represented By: Kirsten Ann Milton
Represented By: Julia Sarah Wolf
Represented By: Sean C. Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?