Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Plaintiff: Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", Xi'an Zhizun Internation al Trade Cosmetics Co., Ltd, Shenzhen Fundy Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Beauty Secret Tech Co., Limited and Guangzhou Guweiduo International Trading Co., Ltd.2
Case Number: 1:2019cv02874
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #40 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/8/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM by Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #40 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION by Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC for entry of default as to all defendants, MOTION by Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC for default judgment as to all defendants (Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC as to a certain Defendant (Martin, Allyson)
July 1, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC as to certain Defendants (Martin, Allyson)
June 10, 2019 Filing 37 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/10/2019.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 8/12/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #30 is granted. Enter order.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 35 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake)
June 7, 2019 Filing 34 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC by Abby Marie Neu (Neu, Abby)
June 7, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Abby M. Neu)(Neu, Abby)
June 5, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant GUANGZHOU GUWEIDUO INTERNATIONAL TRADING CO., LTD.-2 and all other Defendants identified in the Amended Complaint.(pj, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #30 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/10/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
June 5, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM by Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC in support of motion for preliminary injunction #30 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
June 5, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION by Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin)
June 4, 2019 BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted Greer Burns & Crain, Ltd. for Plaintiff, Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC. Receipt no. 4624224663. (acm)
May 23, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Plaintiff's ex parte motion to extend the temporary restraining order #26 is granted. The TRO #25 is extended to 6/11/2019 at 4:00 p.m. Motion hearing set for 5/28/2019 #28 is stricken. Status hearing set for 5/28/2019 at 9:00 a.m. #24 is stricken and re-set for 6/10/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (jjr, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of extension of time #26 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/28/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
May 22, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM by Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC in support of extension of time #26 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 22, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION by Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Gaudio, Justin)
May 14, 2019 Filing 25 SEALED TEMPORARY Restraining Order. Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/14/2019. (jjr, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs motion for leave to file under seal #6 , ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, and expedited discovery #12 , and motion for electronic service of process pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) #18 are granted. Enter Order. Status hearing set for 5/28/2109 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 23 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #18 , motion for temporary restraining order #12 , motion for leave to file #6 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/14/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #19 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Errata 3)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #18 (Gaudio, Justin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLCfor Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Jessica Heiss by Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC - Exhibit 3 - Parts 11-16. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-11, #2 Exhibit 3-12, #3 Exhibit 3-13, #4 Exhibit 3-14, #5 Exhibit 3-15, #6 Exhibit 3-16)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 6/14/2019 (jh, ).
May 9, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Jessica Heiss by Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC - Exhibit 3 - Parts 1-10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-1, #2 Exhibit 3-2, #3 Exhibit 3-3, #4 Exhibit 3-4, #5 Exhibit 3-5, #6 Exhibit 3-6, #7 Exhibit 3-7, #8 Exhibit 3-8, #9 Exhibit 3-9, #10 Exhibit 3-10)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 6/14/2019 (jh, ).
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Jessica Heiss regarding memorandum in support of motion #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC in support of motion for temporary restraining order #12 (Gaudio, Justin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC for temporary restraining order including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED Complaint by Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 6/14/2019 (jh, ).
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 EXHIBITS by Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC Schedule A regarding complaint #1 . (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 6/14/2019 (jh, ).
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mc, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (mc, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 Trademark)(mc, )
April 30, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15770413. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Jake Michael Christensen
Represented By: Abby Marie Neu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xi'an Zhizun Internation al Trade Cosmetics Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Fundy Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Beauty Secret Tech Co., Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangzhou Guweiduo International Trading Co., Ltd.2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?