Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. v. Does 1-23
Plaintiff: HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC.
Defendant: DOES 1-23, Doe No. 20, John Doe 6, Doe No. 22, Doe No. 3 and John Doe 4
Case Number: 1:2019cv02922
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon receipt of the plaintiff's notices of voluntary dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) #16 , #17 defendants Doe No. 3, Doe No. 20, and Doe No. 22 are dismissed from this case. Mailed notice (air, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Doe Defendant No. 3 (Hierl, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Doe Defendants (Hierl, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon receipt of the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) #13 , defendant Doe No. 6 is dismissed from this case. Mailed notice (air, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon receipt of the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) #12 , defendant Doe No. 4 is dismissed from this case. Mailed notice (air, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Doe Defendant No. 6 (Hierl, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Doe Defendant No. 4 (Hierl, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Doe 4 by Erin Kathryn Russell (Russell, Erin)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: For the reasons explained in the Court's order dated 8/24/15 in case number 15 C 5500, the Court grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to take early discovery #7 . No appearance on the motion is required. However, Plaintiff may not publish the identity of the Doe defendants in any way without further leave of court. Additionally, within three business days after the information requested in the subpoena is produced, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide the person identified by that information with a copy of this order, and a copy of the 8/24/15 order entered in case number 15 C 5500, via overnight delivery. The Doe defendants so identified shall have 30 days from the date he or she receives a copy of the orders to file an objection or other appropriate motion with this Court. The Doe defendants may proceed in this case by pseudonym (based on his or her Doe number or IP address) until further order.Mailed notice (air, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery #7 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 5/15/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM by HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC. in support of motion for discovery #7 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Hierl, Michael)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC. for discovery Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lf, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC. Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 (Hierl, Michael)
May 1, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC. by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15776599. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Hierl, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. v. Does 1-23
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Michael A. Hierl
Represented By: William Benjamin Kalbac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-23
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe No. 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe No. 22
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe No. 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 4
Represented By: Erin Kathryn Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?