Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. v. Does 1-21

Plaintiff: HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC.
Defendant: DOES 1-21, John Doe 10 and John Doe 20
Case Number: 1:2019cv02926
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Doe Defendant No. 20 (Hierl, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Doe 20 by Erin Kathryn Russell (Russell, Erin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Doe Defendant No. 10 (Hierl, Michael)
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion for leave to take discovery prior to Rule 26(f) conference #7 is granted. Plaintiff has leave to issue records subpoenas to the Internet service providers in question. Status hearing set for 7/18/2019 at 9:30 AM. (mk)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery #7 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/14/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM by Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. in support of motion for discovery #7 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Hierl, Michael)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. for discovery Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (sxb, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC. Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 (Hierl, Michael)
May 1, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC. by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15776728. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Hierl, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. v. Does 1-21
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-21
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 20
Represented By: Erin Kathryn Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Michael A. Hierl
Represented By: William Benjamin Kalbac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?