Warren v. IL. Dept. of Healthcare and Family Services Division of Child Support Services, Etal.

Plaintiff: Gerald R. Warren
Defendant: IL. Dept. of Healthcare and Family Services Division of Child Support Services, Etal.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02934
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 ENTERED JUDGMENT Signed by the Courtroom Deputy on 6/18/19.Mailed notice(ca, )
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER : Plaintiff filed a complaint #1 , which the Court dismissed for failure to state a claim #8 . In the Court's order dismissing the complaint, the Court warned Plaintiff that if he submitted an amended complaint that again failed to state a claim, this case would be dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff has submitted an amended complaint #9 , which again fails to state a claim. Accordingly, the amended complaint is dismissed, and this case is terminated. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 6/18/19. [For further details see order].Mailed notice(ca, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 RECEIVED Amended Complaint and no copies by Gerald R. Warren (sxb, )
May 17, 2019 MAILED copy of order dated 5/15/19,an amended complaint form and instructions to Plaintiff. (lf, )
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 demonstrates that he cannot prepay the filing fee and is granted. Summons, however, shall not issue, because the Court dismisses Plaintiff's complaint #1 for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff is granted until June 5, 2019, to submit an amended complaint that states a federal claim. Failure to submit an amended complaint by that date will result in summary dismissal of this lawsuit. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an amended complaint form and instructions along with a copy of this order. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 5/15/2019. Mailed notice (lf, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lf, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Gerald R. Warren for attorney representation (lf, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Gerald R. Warren for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (lf, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (lf, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and one copy by Gerald R. Warren (lf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren v. IL. Dept. of Healthcare and Family Services Division of Child Support Services, Etal.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IL. Dept. of Healthcare and Family Services Division of Child Support Services, Etal.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald R. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?