Rogers v. CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.
Plaintiff: RICHARD ROGERS
Defendant: CSX INTERMODAL TERMINALS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02937
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Filing 47 REMAND with certified copy of order dated 11/03/2020 and letter to Circuit Court of Cook County via email. (rc, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Pursuant to the stipulation to remand #45 , the Clerk's office is directed to remand this case forthwith to the Circuit Court of Cook County. Mailed notice (ags)
October 15, 2020 Filing 45 STIPULATION Stipulation to Remand (Gerbie, David)
July 17, 2020 Filing 44 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: The parties filed a joint status report. #43 The status report states that the parties engaged in a second round of private mediation and have a third round scheduled for 8/25/2020. We grant the parties' joint request to extend the temporary stay we previously issued in this case and modify the current deadlines as requested: discovery on class certification shall close on 3/3/2021; motion for class certification, if any, is due by 4/8/2021; and the response to any motion for class certification is due by 5/6/2021. These deadlines are firm and final. The parties shall file a joint status report within seven days following their next mediation session. The status hearing set for 10/15/2020 is stricken and reset for 3/4/2021 at 10:30 a.m. It is so ordered. Mailed notice (ags)
July 15, 2020 Filing 43 STATUS Report (Joint Status Report on Settlement) by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. (Griswold, Joel)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk5, Docket)
June 26, 2020 Filing 41 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: The parties filed a joint status report. #40 The status report states that the parties engaged in a round of private mediation on 6/18/2020 and have a second round of private mediation scheduled for 7/8/2020. We grant the parties' joint request to extend the temporary stay we previously issued in this case until 7/15/2020. By 7/15/2020, the parties shall file another joint status report detailing the private mediation's progress. The status hearing set for 10/15/2020 stands. It is so ordered. Mailed notice (ags)
June 25, 2020 Filing 40 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Richard Rogers (Gerbie, David)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket6, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: The parties filed a joint status report. #37 The status report indicates that the parties will undergo a private mediation session on 6/18/2020, and request a discovery stay until then. We grant that request and temporarily stay discovery until 6/19/2020. The parties shall file a joint status report on private mediation progress by 6/25/2020. Notwithstanding this stay, we revise the case schedule #27 as follows: discovery as to class certification shall close on 11/12/2020; the motion for class certification, if any, is due by 12/10/2020, with Defendants' response due 12/24/2020. The status hearing set for 10/15/2020 stands. This case's deadlines will not be impacted by the court's general orders related to COVID-19 absent good cause shown. It is so ordered. Mailed notice (ags)
May 18, 2020 Filing 37 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
May 13, 2020 Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Richard Rogers by Brendan James Duffner (Duffner, Brendan)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket5, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket13, )
March 23, 2020 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Motion to withdraw as attorney #31 is granted. Attorney Jad Sheikali is terminated as counsel for plaintiff. Motion hearing set for 4/24/2020 is stricken. Mailed notice (ags)
March 20, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Motion by David Louis Gerbie for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #31 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 4/24/2020 at 10:30 AM. (Gerbie, David)
March 20, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION by Attorney Jad Sheikali to withdraw as attorney for Richard Rogers. No party information provided (Gerbie, David)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (td, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 29 Joint Notice Regarding Mediation by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
October 31, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative and Other Defenses by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.(DelGobbo, Bonnie)
October 17, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Status hearing held. The Court adopts paragraphs 1, 2, and 3 of the proposed joint discovery plan submitted in open court. Defendant's answer to the complaint is due by 10/31/2019. Discovery will be bifurcated between class certification issues and general merits issues. Discovery as to class certification issues shall end by 8/31/2020. Plaintiff shall file a motion for class certification no later than 9/30/2020; defendant's response by 10/30/2020. No request for extension for discovery will be allowed. The parties shall submit to the Court a joint notice on or before 3/1/2020 with the results of mediation. Status hearing is set for 10/15/2020 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Status hearing held and continued to 10/17/2019 at 10:30 a.m. At that time the parties are expected to report on the status of settlement or to come to court with a proposed joint discovery plan. Mailed notice (ags, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: The status hearing set for today 9/12/2019 is stricken and reset to 9/19/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER: For the reasons stated herein, the motion to dismiss #16 is granted in part and denied in part. See Statement. Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 9/5/2019. Mailed notice (ags, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY by Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. to response in opposition to motion #22 (Hewitt, Melissa)
June 28, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE by Richard Rogersin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. #16 (Gerbie, David)
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Richard Rogers by Jad Sheikali (Sheikali, Jad)
June 14, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Minute entry #19 is modified to state that the due date for defendant to answer the complaint is stricken, pending resolution of the motion to dismiss. Mailed notice (ags, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Defendant's motion for extension of time to answer #13 is granted. Defendant shall answer the complaint by 6/21/2019. Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss #16 is due by 7/1/2019; defendant's reply by 7/11/2019. Motion hearing date of 6/20/2019 is stricken. Status hearing set for 6/27/2019 is stricken and reset to 9/12/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Bonnie Keane DelGobbo for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #16 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 6/20/2019 at 10:30 AM. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
June 7, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #16 (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
June 7, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. by Melissa M Hewitt (Hewitt, Melissa)
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Bonnie Keane DelGobbo for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #13 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 6/20/2019 at 10:30 AM. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Bonnie Keane DelGobbo of Change of Address (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Motion for extension of time to answer #9 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 6/7/2019. Motion hearing date of 5/9/2019 is stricken. Status hearing set for 6/27/2019 remains set. Mailed notice (ags, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Bonnie Keane DelGobbo for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #9 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 5/9/2019 at 10:30 AM. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or otherwise respond to complaint (UNOPPOSED) (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. by Joel Griswold (Griswold, Joel)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (tt, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing is set for 6/27/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CSX INTERMODAL TERMINALS, INC. by Joyce E Ackerbaum Cox Joel C. Griswold (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by CSX INTERMODAL TERMINALS, INC. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CSX INTERMODAL TERMINALS, INC. by Bonnie Keane DelGobbo (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2019 CH 04168) filed by CSX INTERMODAL TERMINALS, INC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15779266. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(DelGobbo, Bonnie)
May 1, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX INTERMODAL TERMINALS, INC.
Represented By: Bonnie Keane DelGobbo
Represented By: Melissa M Hewitt
Represented By: Joel Griswold
Represented By: Joyce E Ackerbaum Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD ROGERS
Represented By: David Louis Gerbie
Represented By: Jad Sheikali
Represented By: Brendan James Duffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?