Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Plaintiff: Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Case Number: 1:2019cv02938
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 53 DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 7/2/2019. Mailed notice(gel, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 52 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held on 7/2/2019. Based upon the filing of the notices of voluntary dismissal #45 , #46 and #47 , Defendants CHIC & Fun, X CHIC, Aihua Stylish Store, Gurioo Official Store, QINUO Phone Accessories Store, YOMILE Store and QINUO Store are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's motion for entry of default judgment #48 is granted. Enter default judgment order. All pending deadlines and hearings are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (gel, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 51 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on June 5, 2019, before the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Order Number: 34951. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura LaCien, 312-408-5032, laura_lacien@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2019. (Lacien, Laura)
June 26, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #48 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 7/2/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM by Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #48 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION by Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC for entry of default as to all defendants, MOTION by Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC for default judgment as to all defendants (Gaudio, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC as to certain Defendants (Johnson, RiKaleigh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC as to certain Defendants (Johnson, RiKaleigh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC as to certain Defendants (Johnson, RiKaleigh)
June 5, 2019 Filing 44 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/5/2019. Mailed notice(gel, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status and motion hearing held on 6/5/2019. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #37 is granted. Enter Order for Preliminary Injunction. Based upon the filing of the notice of voluntary dismissal #36 , Defendant, cbzulu is dismissed without prejudice. Status hearing previously set for 6/13/2019 is reset for 8/6/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Abby M. Neu)(Neu, Abby)
June 4, 2019 Filing 41 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC by Abby Marie Neu (Neu, Abby)
June 4, 2019 Filing 40 STATUS Report by Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
May 31, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Zou Liang Liang and all other Defendants identified in the Amended Complaint (jn, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #37 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/5/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
May 30, 2019 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM by Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC in support of motion for preliminary injunction #37 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 30, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION by Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin)
May 30, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC as to a certain Defendant (Johnson, RiKaleigh)
May 28, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Zou Liang Liang and all other Defendants identified in the Amended Complaint (rc, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 35 Surety BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC. (Document not scanned) (ek, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiff's ex parte motion #31 to extend the temporary restraining order entered 5/9/19 is granted. The Court finds that good cause exists to extend the temporary restraining order, and the order is hereby extended an additional fourteen days, to 6/6/19. The 5/23/19 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. The status hearing set for 5/23/19 is stricken and reset for 6/5/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of extension of time #31 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 5/23/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM by Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC in support of extension of time #31 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION by Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Gaudio, Justin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 30 SEALED ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 5/9/2019. Mailed notice(gel, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held on 5/9/19. Plaintiffs' motions for leave to file under seal #6 and for electronic service of process #20 are granted. Plaintiffs' ex parte motion for temporary restraining order #14 is also granted. Enter sealed order. Status hearing set for 5/23/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake)
May 8, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson)
May 7, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP Standing Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Courts official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 6/13/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 6/3/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
May 3, 2019 Filing 24 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
May 3, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for leave to file #6 , motion for temporary restraining order #14 , motion for miscellaneous relief #20 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 5/9/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
May 3, 2019 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #21 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 3, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM by Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #20 (Gaudio, Justin)
May 3, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION by Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
May 3, 2019 Filing 19 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC Exhibit 3 regarding declaration #17 (Gaudio, Justin)
May 3, 2019 Filing 18 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC Exhibit 2 - Parts 1-8 regarding declaration #17 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2-1, #2 Exhibit 2-2, #3 Exhibit 2-3, #4 Exhibit 2-4, #5 Exhibit 2-5, #6 Exhibit 2-6, #7 Exhibit 2-7, #8 Exhibit 2-8)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 3, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Alastair Gray regarding memorandum in support of motion #15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 3, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 3, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC in support of motion for temporary restraining order #14 (Gaudio, Justin)
May 3, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC for temporary restraining order including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Defendant Domain Names, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
May 3, 2019 Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin)
May 3, 2019 Filing 12 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin)
May 2, 2019 Filing 11 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (ek, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Correction regarding #8 (ek, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(ek, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (ek, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, )
May 1, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15779334. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: RiKaleigh C. Johnson
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Abby Marie Neu
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Jake Michael Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?