Art Akiane LLC v. Art & SoulWorks LLC et al
Plaintiff: Art Akiane LLC
Defendant: Art & SoulWorks LLC and Carol Corneliuson
Case Number: 1:2019cv02952
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: The parties are directed to conference call the courtroom deputy at 312-408-5178 by 7/8/2019 to set a settlement conference date. The parties are directed to contact their respective clients in advance of the conference call to procure 3 or 4 dates that they and the principals are available for a settlement conference between 7/22/2019 and 8/8/2019.Mailed notice (jms, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 29 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Jeffrey Cole for the purpose of holding a settlement conference.(slb, )Emailed notice.
June 25, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing held. Counsel for both sides agreed to a settlement referral to the magistrate judge. In light of the settlement referral, the answer deadline to the counterclaim and all other deadlines are suspended for now (though the counter-defendants should arrange for attorney representation). The magistrate judge may order any discovery needed for a productive settlement conference. The parties are hoping to expedite the settlement conference, that is, sometime in 07/2019. Status hearing set for 08/06/2019 at 9 a.m.Emailed notice (slb, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Carol Corneliuson, Art & SoulWorks LLC against Art Akiane LLC . by Carol Corneliuson, Art & SoulWorks LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Auerbach, Nicole)
June 7, 2019 Filing 26 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5-23-19 before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. 34849. Order Number: 19-2952. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, krista_burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312- 435-5567.

< Redaction Request due 6/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2019. (Burgeson, Krista)
May 23, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Motion hearing held on Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order #11 . As discussed during the hearing, the disputes presented in the TRO motion have substantially narrowed. There is no current dispute that (a) the defense may sell the inventory purchased at wholesale; (b) most of the licensed-based sales are finished with the possible exception of two products; and (c) Defendant Corneliuson may sell the private-collection works. At most, an expedited preliminary injunction would be warranted after conferral with the defense on the two licensed-based products and on the new issue raised by Plaintiff as to particular social media displays. With regard to the litigation track, defense counsel accepted service in court on behalf of Defendants. Defendants' answer or response due 06/24/2019. Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project disclosures due 07/24/2019. The status hearing of 06/12/2019 is reset for 06/25/2019 at 10:00 a.m. Now that these sets of counsel are advising the parties, the Court strongly encourages the parties to avoid the risks, attorneys' fees, and delay of litigation -- not to mention the unfortunate acrimony after a long relationship. The parties may jointly notify the courtroom deputy if they want a settlement referral to the magistrate judge. Emailed notice (slb, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Carolyn Corneliuson (Auerbach, Nicole)
May 23, 2019 Filing 23 AMENDED declaration, #21 Amended Exhibit 3 to Declaration (Auerbach, Nicole)
May 23, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED response to motion #20 for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including Temporary Injunction and a Temporary Asset Restraint (Auerbach, Nicole)
May 22, 2019 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Carolyn Corneliuson regarding response to motion #20 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Auerbach, Nicole)
May 22, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE by Art & SoulWorks LLC, Carol Corneliuson to MOTION by Plaintiff Art Akiane LLC for temporary restraining order #11 (Auerbach, Nicole)
May 22, 2019 Filing 19 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Defendants Corporate Disclosure Statement (Auerbach, Nicole)
May 22, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Art & SoulWorks LLC, Carol Corneliuson by Salvador Andrew Carranza (Carranza, Salvador)
May 22, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Art & SoulWorks LLC, Carol Corneliuson by Patrick J. Lamb (Lamb, Patrick)
May 22, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Art & SoulWorks LLC, Carol Corneliuson by Nicole Nehama Auerbach (Auerbach, Nicole)
May 21, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Plaintiff's motion #10 to use extra pages is granted. For docketing purposes, Plaintiff's memorandum #12 is terminated as a motion; it is actually the brief in support of R. 11. Emailed notice (slb, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 CORRECTED - NOTICE of Motion by Richard Eric Gaum for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order #12 , motion for temporary restraining order #11 , motion for leave to file excess pages #10 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/23/2019 at 01:30 PM. (Gaum, Richard)
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Richard Eric Gaum for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order #12 , motion for temporary restraining order #11 , motion for leave to file excess pages #10 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/23/2019 at 01:30 PM. (Gaum, Richard)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Art Akiane LLC for temporary restraining order - Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Declaration Akiane Kramarik, #2 Declaration Mark Kramarik)(Gaum, Richard)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Art Akiane LLC for temporary restraining order (Gaum, Richard)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Art Akiane LLC for leave to file excess pages (Gaum, Richard)
May 17, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Art & SoulWorks LLC, Carol Corneliuson. (ew, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Application by Richard Eric Gaum to appear pro hac vice #8 on behalf of Plaintiff Art Akiane LLC is granted. Emailed notice (slb, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15836681. (Gaum, Richard)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Art Akiane LLC by Marcus Stephen Harris (Harris, Marcus)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Initial status hearing set for 06/12/2019 at 9:30 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (gcy, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
May 2, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Art Akiane LLC by Adam Wolek (Wolek, Adam)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Art Akiane LLC (Wolek, Adam)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Art Akiane LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15781684. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolek, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Art Akiane LLC v. Art & SoulWorks LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Art Akiane LLC
Represented By: Adam Wolek
Represented By: Richard Eric Gaum
Represented By: Marcus Stephen Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art & SoulWorks LLC
Represented By: Patrick J. Lamb
Represented By: Nicole Nehama Auerbach
Represented By: Salvador Andrew Carranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Corneliuson
Represented By: Patrick J. Lamb
Represented By: Nicole Nehama Auerbach
Represented By: Salvador Andrew Carranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?