Cash v. VanVickle et al
Plaintiff: Christopher L. Cash
Defendant: Ogle County, Illinois, Brian E. VanVickle, Ogle County Sheriff's Office, County of Ogle, Illinois and Ogle County's Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 1:2019cv02955
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Iain D Johnston
Referring Judge: Philip G Reinhard
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Presentment of the motion to dismiss #25 set for 8/13/2019 is stricken and is reset to 10/8/2019 at 10:00 AM. The initial status hearing previously set for 10/8/2019 at 9:00 AM is moved to 10:00 AM that same day to coincide with the presentment of the motion to dismiss. (yxp, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Motion by Michael John Orsi for presentment of motion to dismiss #25 before Honorable Iain D. Johnston on 8/13/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Orsi, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 26 Memo of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by County of Ogle, Illinois, Ogle County's Sheriff's Office, Brian E. VanVickle (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Orsi, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION by Defendants County of Ogle, Illinois, Ogle County's Sheriff's Office, Brian E. VanVickle to dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Orsi, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: The plaintiff's motion to continue #22 is agreed and granted. The initial status hearing previously set for 8/8/2019 is stricken and is reset to 10/8/2019 at 9:00 AM. Presentment of the motion set for 7/30/2019 is stricken. (yxp, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 23 Agreed Motion for Continuance of Initial Status Hearing NOTICE of Motion by Cynthia Nicole Pietrucha for presentment of motion to continue #22 before Honorable Iain D. Johnston on 7/30/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Pietrucha, Cynthia)
July 24, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION by Plaintiff Christopher L. Cash to continue Initial Status Hearing 8/8/2019 (Pietrucha, Cynthia)
July 3, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: The defendants' motion for an extension of time #20 is granted. Answers from all defendants are now due 8/5/2019. Counsel is reminded that motions must be set for presentment. See Local Rule 5.3(b). Mailed notice (jp, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendants County of Ogle, Illinois, Ogle County's Sheriff's Office for extension of time to file response/reply as to attorney appearance #18 , affidavit of service #9 , affidavit of service #10 , attorney appearance #12 , attorney appearance #19 (Orsi, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants County of Ogle, Illinois, Ogle County's Sheriff's Office, Brian E. VanVickle by Michael John Orsi (Orsi, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants County of Ogle, Illinois, Ogle County's Sheriff's Office, Brian E. VanVickle by Scott George Salemi (Salemi, Scott)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: The initial status hearing set for 6/27/2019 is stricken and reset to 8/8/2019 at 9:00 AM. Lead counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear in person at the initial status hearing. Mailed notice (jp, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Christopher L. Cash (Pietrucha, Cynthia)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by County of Ogle, Illinois. County of Ogle, Illinois waiver sent on 6/4/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Roth, Andrew)
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ogle County's Sheriff's Office. Ogle County's Sheriff's Office waiver sent on 6/4/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Roth, Andrew)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Brian E. VanVickle. Brian E. VanVickle waiver sent on 6/4/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Roth, Andrew)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants County of Ogle, Illinois, Ogle County's Sheriff's Office, Brian E. VanVickle by Andrew J Roth (Roth, Andrew)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Brian E. VanVickle on 6/4/2019 by Plaintiff Christopher L. Cash. Waiver of service due by 7/5/2019. (Pietrucha, Cynthia)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Christopher L. Cash regarding Summons, Complaint, Notification of 5/7/2019 Docket Entry served on Ogle County c/o Laura J. Cook on 5/23/2019 (Pietrucha, Cynthia)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Christopher L. Cash regarding Summons, Complaint, Notification of 5/7/2019 Docket Entry served on Ogle County Sheriff's Office c/o Mindy Barker on 5/23/2019 (Pietrucha, Cynthia)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 PAYMENT of Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15847086. (Pietrucha, Cynthia)
May 21, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants County of Ogle, Illinois, Ogle County's Sheriff's Office, Brian E. VanVickle (pg, )
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 5/10/2019: Plaintiffs application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #5 is denied. Plaintiff must pay the full filing fee of $400.00 by June 10, 2019. Failure to do so will result in summary dismissal of this case. Additionally, summons issued in this case in error and are stricken. Summons may be re-issued in the event the full filing fee is paid. [see STATEMENT] Mailed notice (kms)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christopher L. Cash by Mohit Khare (Khare, Mohit)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Christopher L. Cash for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and Financial Affidavit (Pietrucha, Cynthia)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Initial status hearing set for 6/27/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on the Court's webpage under Initial Status Conferences and Reports and file by 6/21/2019. Lead counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear in person at the initial status hearing. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. (yxp, )
May 7, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants County of Ogle, Illinois, Ogle County's Sheriff's Office, Brian E. VanVickle (pg, )
May 2, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christopher L. Cash by Cynthia Nicole Pietrucha (Pietrucha, Cynthia)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Pietrucha, Cynthia)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Christopher L. Cash; Jury Demand. (Pietrucha, Cynthia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cash v. VanVickle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ogle County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian E. VanVickle
Represented By: Michael John Orsi
Represented By: Scott George Salemi
Represented By: Andrew J Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ogle County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Ogle, Illinois
Represented By: Michael John Orsi
Represented By: Scott George Salemi
Represented By: Andrew J Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ogle County's Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Michael John Orsi
Represented By: Scott George Salemi
Represented By: Andrew J Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher L. Cash
Represented By: Cynthia Nicole Pietrucha
Represented By: Mohit Khare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?