Cohan v. First FM, LLC

Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Defendant: First FM, LLC, d/b/a Hampton Inn & Suites Chicago-Downtown and First FM, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02994
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Rachel L Schaller for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 7/16/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Schaller, Rachel)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant First FM, LLC for extension of time to file answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint (Schaller, Rachel)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant First FM, LLC by Rachel L Schaller (Schaller, Rachel)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 7/16/19 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Howard Cohan. First FM, LLC waiver sent on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Kaplan, Robert)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ew, )
May 3, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Howard Cohan by Robert Michael Kaplan (Kaplan, Robert)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Howard Cohan; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15787239. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaplan, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohan v. First FM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Represented By: Robert Michael Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First FM, LLC, d/b/a Hampton Inn & Suites Chicago-Downtown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First FM, LLC
Represented By: Rachel L Schaller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?