Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 73.9.193.184

Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 73.9.193.184
Case Number: 1:2019cv03000
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: The Court previously allowed plaintiff's counsel to proceed with expedited discovery and issue subpoena(s) to determine the identity of the Doe defendant #9 . In the meantime, plaintiff's Doe complaint is dismissed without prejudice to the filing of a proper amended complaint which expressly names the defendant. All discovery and third party subpoenas must be complied with even though the pending complaint is dismissed without prejudice. This case is dismissed for administrative purposes. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's Motion To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior to A Rule 26(f) Conference #6 is granted. Motion hearing date of 5/16/19 is stricken. Plaintiff has demonstrated good cause to conduct early discovery, in order to identify the defendants in this case. Plaintiff may issue Rule 45 subpoenas to the internet service providers associated with the defendants' IP addresses to obtain the names and addresses of the subscribers, and Plaintiff may use the information solely for purposes of this litigation. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/16/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Schulz, Mary)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCfor early discovery (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (Attachments: #1 Copyright numbers) (aee, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
May 3, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15787429. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 73.9.193.184
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Mary K. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 73.9.193.184
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?