Castelli et al v. Apple Inc.

Plaintiff: Karen Lyvers, Brianna Castelli and Matthew White
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03026
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Case is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #20 . Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (lk, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Coleman, Gregory)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Brianna Castelli, Karen Lyvers, Matthew White by Matthew William Lanahan (Lanahan, Matthew)
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brianna Castelli, Matthew White, Karen Lyvers as to Apple Inc. on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (Coleman, Gregory)
June 4, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorney Jeffrey Glaspie's Motion to appear pro hac vice #15 is granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant's Agreed Motion for extension of time to respond to Complaint #13 is granted. Answer shall be filed by 7/1/2019. Motion hearing set for 6/17/2019 is stricken.Mailed notice (lk, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15888762. (Glaspie, Jeffrey)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by John C. Ellis for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #13 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/17/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Ellis, John)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Apple Inc. for extension of time to file answer or other responsive pleading in response to the Complaint (AGREED) (Ellis, John)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Apple Inc. by John C. Ellis (Ellis, John)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 7/15/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 7/10/2019. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorneys Adam Edwards, William Ladnier and Justin Day's Motions to appear pro hac vice #7 , #8 and #9 are granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15802124. (Day, Justin)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15801876. (Ladnier, William)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15801700. (Attachments: #1 Additional Admission Information)(Edwards, Adam)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Brianna Castelli, Karen Lyvers, Matthew White by Nick Suciu, III (Suciu, Nick)
May 6, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Apple Inc. (jjr, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
May 6, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Brianna Castelli, Karen Lyvers, Matthew White by Rachel Lynn Soffin (Soffin, Rachel)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Brianna Castelli, Karen Lyvers, Matthew White by Gregory F Coleman (Coleman, Gregory)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Coleman, Gregory)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Brianna Castelli, Matthew White, Karen Lyvers; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15790946.(Coleman, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castelli et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Lyvers
Represented By: Rachel Lynn Soffin
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Represented By: Justin G Day
Represented By: Jeffrey Harold Glaspie
Represented By: Adam Arthur Edwards
Represented By: Matthew William Lanahan
Represented By: William A Ladnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna Castelli
Represented By: Rachel Lynn Soffin
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Represented By: Justin G Day
Represented By: Jeffrey Harold Glaspie
Represented By: Adam Arthur Edwards
Represented By: Matthew William Lanahan
Represented By: William A Ladnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew White
Represented By: Rachel Lynn Soffin
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Represented By: Justin G Day
Represented By: Jeffrey Harold Glaspie
Represented By: Adam Arthur Edwards
Represented By: Matthew William Lanahan
Represented By: William A Ladnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: John C. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?