Grasty v. Marshall
Appellee: Marilyn O. Marshall
Appellant: Diahann Grasty
Case Number: 1:2019cv03044
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 18 APPELLEE'S Brief by Marilyn O. Marshall (Olivadoti, Onofrio)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee Marilyn O. Marshall by Onofrio Anthony Olivadoti (Olivadoti, Onofrio)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Appellant's motion to file opening brief instanter #10 is granted. Appellee's response brief to be filed by 7/1/2019. Appellant's reply brief to be filed by 7/15/2019. Appellee's notice for presentment of motion to challenge jurisdiction #12 and motion to remand #14 on 6/25/2019 is stricken and reset to 7/11/2019 at 9:00 AM. Appellee is reminded to review the Court's website regarding dates when the Court is in session before filing any further motions. Emergency motions should follow the procedure set forth on the website. Mailed notice (cn).
June 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Diahann Grasty for presentment of motion #14 before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 6/25/2019 at 8:45 AM. (sxb, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Appellant Diahann Grasty (Exhibit) (sxb, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Diahann Grasty for presentment of motion #12 before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 6/25/2019 at 8:45 AM. (sxb, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Appellant Diahann Grasty (Exhibit) (sxb, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Diahann Grasty for presentment of motion #10 before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 6/25/2019 at 8:45 AM. (sxb, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Appellant Diahann Grasty (Attachments: #1 Appellants Reply Brief) (sxb, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Appellant Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Exhibit)(USBC-Ross, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 5/22/2019. Oral argument held on appellant's emergency motion for a stay or an injunction pending appeal #6 . The motion is denied. Appellant's emergency motion for a stay or an injunction pending appeal #4 is denied as moot. Appellant's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #5 is granted. Appellant is directed to ensure service is executed on the appellee. Appellant's oral request for an extension is granted. Appellant shall serve and file the opening brief by 6/12/2019. Appellee shall serve and file the response brief by 6/26/2019. Appellant may serve and file a reply brief by 7/10/2019. Once it is fully briefed, the appeal will be taken under advisement. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Diahann Grasty for presentment of Emergency Motion for a Stay or an Injunction Pending Appeal before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 5/22/2019 at 08:45 AM. (lf, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 EMERGENCY MOTION by Appellant Diahann Grasty for a Stay or an Injunction Pending Appeal (Exhibits); Notice. (lf, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Bankruptcy Rule 8009(a) requires the appellant to file its opening brief within 14 days after the entry of the appeal on the docket. The appellant shall serve and file the opening brief by 5/29/2019. The appellee shall serve and file the response brief by 6/12/2019. The appellant may serve and file a reply brief by 6/26/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION by Appellant Diahann Grasty for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (lf, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 EMERGENCY MOTION by Appellant Diahann Grasty for a Stay or an Injunction Pending Appeal (Exhibits). (lf, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 Rule 8010 letter)(lf, )
May 6, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 18 B 2407 (Judge Barnes) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter NOA, #3 BK Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 In Forma Pauperis, #6 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grasty v. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Marilyn O. Marshall
Represented By: Onofrio Anthony Olivadoti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Diahann Grasty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?