DOE, v. Township High School District No. 214

Plaintiff: Township High School District No. 214 and JANE DOE, Individually and as the legal guardian of JOHN DOE, a Minor
Case Number: 1:2019cv03052
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion hearing held. Motion by Defendant Township High School District No. 214 to stay Defendants motion to stay written discovery pending this Courts determination of its 12(b)(6) #17 is granted. Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim and 12(f) motion to strike Plaintiff Jane Doe's fictitious name #14 is taken under advisement; response due 7/23/2019; reply due 8/6/2019; the Court will issue a ruling by mail. (cdh, )
June 20, 2019 MOTION by Defendant Township High School District No. 214 to Strike Plaintiff Jane Does Fictitious Name (Omitted relief from motion #14 (bg, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 STATUS Report Parties' Rule 26(f) Initial Status Report by JANE DOE, Individually and as the legal guardian of JOHN DOE, a Minor (Sender, Jennifer)
June 20, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Deborah Anne Ostvig for presentment of motion to stay #17 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 6/25/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Ostvig, Deborah)
June 20, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant Township High School District No. 214 to stay Defendants Motion to Stay Written Discovery Pending This Courts Determination of Its 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss (Ostvig, Deborah)
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by Township High School District No. 214 in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #14 Defendants Memorandum In Support of Its 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint and 12(f) Motion to Strike Plaintiff Jane Does Fictitious Name (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Ostvig, Deborah)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Deborah Anne Ostvig for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #14 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 6/25/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Ostvig, Deborah)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Township High School District No. 214 Defendants 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint and 12(f) Motion to Strike Plaintiff Jane Does Fictitious Name (Ostvig, Deborah)
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service Re: Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Program by Jennifer Lundy Sender on behalf of JANE DOE, Individually and as the legal guardian of JOHN DOE, a Minor (Sender, Jennifer)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by JANE DOE, Individually and as the legal guardian of JOHN DOE, a Minor. Township High School District No. 214 waiver sent on 5/7/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Sender, Jennifer)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Township High School District No. 214 by Nicholas D Standiford (Standiford, Nicholas)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Township High School District No. 214 by Jonathon Robert Sommerfeld (Sommerfeld, Jonathon)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Township High School District No. 214 by Erika Gina Baldonado (Baldonado, Erika)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Township High School District No. 214 by Deborah Anne Ostvig (Ostvig, Deborah)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 JURY Demand (Kujawa, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Township High School District No. 214 by Michael E. Kujawa (Kujawa, Michael)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 6/25/2019 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff JANE DOE, Individually and as the legal guardian of JOHN DOE, a Minor by Andres Javier Gallegos (Gallegos, Andres)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff JANE DOE, Individually and as the legal guardian of JOHN DOE, a Minor by Jennifer Lundy Sender (Sender, Jennifer)
May 6, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by JANE DOE, Individually and as the legal guardian of JOHN DOE, a Minor; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15793952. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sender, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOE, v. Township High School District No. 214
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Township High School District No. 214
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE, Individually and as the legal guardian of JOHN DOE, a Minor
Represented By: Jennifer Lundy Sender
Represented By: Andres Javier Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?