Boyce v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: NATHANIEL J BOYCE and Nathaniel Boyce
Defendant: derrick e shinn, jamesa j jackson, Nigel L Valentine, Derrick Shinn and Jamesa Jackson
Case Number: 1:2019cv03117
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Nathaniel Boyce. (Dunn, Glen)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Unopposed motion for extension of time to 7/12/2019 to answer #6 is granted. Scheduling conference previously set for 8/15/2019 to stand. (See prior order for additional information.) Mailed notice (reg)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth Kathryn Hanford for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #6 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 6/17/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Hanford, Elizabeth)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendant Nigel L Valentine for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Hanford, Elizabeth)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nigel L Valentine by Elizabeth Kathryn Hanford (Hanford, Elizabeth)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 8/15/2019 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) planning report re MIDP due 8/12/2019. The report must comply with the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg)
May 9, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Jamesa Jackson, Derrick Shinn, Nigel L Valentine (mc, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff NATHANIEL J BOYCE by Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr (Dunn, Glen)
May 8, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by NATHANIEL J BOYCE; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15804963. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunn, Glen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyce v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: derrick e shinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jamesa j jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nigel L Valentine
Represented By: Elizabeth Kathryn Hanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Shinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamesa Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHANIEL J BOYCE
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Boyce
Represented By: Glen Joseph Dunn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?