Bondar Insurance Group, Inc. v. Starr Insurance Holdings Inc. et al
Plaintiff: BONDAR INSURANCE GROUP, INC., a/k/a BIG, INC., Bondar Insurance Group, Inc. and Big
Defendant: ENGLE MARTIN & ASSOCIATES, LLC, STARR INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC. and Starr Insurance Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03188
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Unopposed motion for enlargement of time for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's amended complaint #13 and motion to continue status hearing #16 are granted. Status hearing reset for 7/1/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Notice of motion date of 6/24/2019 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Engle Martin & Associates, LLC, Starr Insurance Holdings, LLC (Foran, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Plaintiff Bondar Insurance Group, Inc. to continue hearing (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Krider, Keith)
June 18, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to amended complaint by Engle Martin & Associates, LLC, Starr Insurance Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Foran, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Leonard Foran for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #13 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 6/25/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Foran, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendants Engle Martin & Associates, LLC, Starr Insurance Holdings, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint #12 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time (Foran, Michael)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED complaint by Bondar Insurance Group, Inc. against Engle Martin & Associates, LLC, Starr Insurance Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Krider, Keith)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint motion and stipulation regarding amended complaint #8 is granted; Plaintiff may file an amended complaint on or before June 3, 2019 and Defendants will file their responsive pleadings on or before June 17, 2019. Notice of motion date of 5/29/2019 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. This case remains set for status haring on 6/27/2019 at 9:45 a.m. (cdh, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bondar Insurance Group, Inc. by Keith Roger Krider (Krider, Keith)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Leonard Foran for presentment of motion for leave to file #8 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 5/29/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Foran, Michael)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendants Engle Martin & Associates, LLC, Starr Insurance Holdings, LLC for leave to file JOINT Motion and Stipulation Regarding Amended Complaint (Foran, Michael)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED copy of notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (nsf, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 6/27/2019 at 9:45 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ENGLE MARTIN & ASSOCIATES, LLC, STARR INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC. by James John Knibbs (Knibbs, James)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ENGLE MARTIN & ASSOCIATES, LLC, STARR INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC. by Michael Leonard Foran (Foran, Michael)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2019L003886) filed by ENGLE MARTIN & ASSOCIATES, LLC, STARR INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15814361. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B--Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Foran, Michael)
May 10, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bondar Insurance Group, Inc. v. Starr Insurance Holdings Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENGLE MARTIN & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: James John Knibbs
Represented By: Michael Leonard Foran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STARR INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: James John Knibbs
Represented By: Michael Leonard Foran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Insurance Holdings, LLC
Represented By: James John Knibbs
Represented By: Michael Leonard Foran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BONDAR INSURANCE GROUP, INC., a/k/a BIG, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bondar Insurance Group, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Roger Krider
Represented By: Russell W. Hartigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big
Represented By: Keith Roger Krider
Represented By: Russell W. Hartigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?