Illinois Public Risk Fund v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Illinois Public Risk Fund
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Actavis Elizabeth, LLC., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Joseph Giacchino, Purdue Pharma, Inc., American Academy of Pain Medicine, American Geriatric Society, American Pain Society, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Actavis PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., ALLERGAN PLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS, Cephalon, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., ACTAVIS KADIAN, LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Paul Madison, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03210
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, the ruling date of 7/11/2019 is vacated and reset to 7/16/2019 at 9:30 AM. (mk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY by Plaintiff Illinois Public Risk Fund to motion to remand #11 (Murray, Alfred)
June 6, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE by McKesson Corporationin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Public Risk Fund to remand #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Stanner, Daniel)
June 1, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to complaint #24 is granted. This does not affect the schedule for briefing plaintiff's motion to remand. (mk)
May 28, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by Emily Newhouse Dillingham for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer,,, #24 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/4/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Dillingham, Emily)
May 28, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION by Defendants Actavis Elizabeth, LLC., Actavis Kadian, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding notice of removal #1 / MANUFACTURER DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (Dillingham, Emily)
May 28, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Sherry Ann Knutson of Tucker Ellis LLP (Knutson, Sherry)
May 28, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. by Emily Newhouse Dillingham (Dillingham, Emily)
May 24, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amerisourcebergen Corporation by Margaret Marcia Schuchardt (Schuchardt, Margaret)
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amerisourcebergen Corporation by Daniel I. Schlessinger (Schlessinger, Daniel)
May 23, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 5/23/2019. Motion for leave to file excess pages #13 and motion for extension of time #15 are granted. Motion to stay #17 is denied for reasons stated in open court. The 5/28/2019 motion hearing is vacated. Response to motion to remand #11 due by 6/6/2019; replies due by 6/20/2019. Ruling set for 7/11/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel L. Stanner for presentment of motion to stay, #17 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/28/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Stanner, Daniel)
May 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant McKesson Corporation to stay proceedings pending likely transfer to multidistrict litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Stanner, Daniel)
May 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Meyer, Julie)
May 21, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant McKesson Corporation for extension of time (Stanner, Daniel)
May 21, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel L. Stanner for presentment of before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/23/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Stanner, Daniel)
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Public Risk Fund for leave to file excess pages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Remand)(Murray, Alfred)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Alfred Kirkland Murray, II for presentment of before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/23/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Murray, Alfred)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Public Risk Fund to remand (Murray, Alfred)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Alfred Kirkland Murray, II for presentment of before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/23/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Murray, Alfred)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. by Julie Fix Meyer (Meyer, Julie)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. by Julie Fix Meyer (Meyer, Julie) (PDF not legible - Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office.). Modified on 5/21/2019 (aee, ).
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Public Risk Fund by Alfred Kirkland Murray, II (Murray, Alfred)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (aee, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant McKesson Corporation by Kyle Alexander Cooper (Cooper, Kyle)
May 13, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ew, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by McKesson Corporation (Stanner, Daniel)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant McKesson Corporation by Daniel L. Stanner (Stanner, Daniel)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stanner, Daniel)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2019 CH 05847) filed by McKesson Corporation Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15820858. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stanner, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Illinois Public Risk Fund v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Kyle Alexander Cooper
Represented By: Daniel L. Stanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Newhouse Dillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Giacchino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Academy of Pain Medicine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Geriatric Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Pain Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Newhouse Dillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Newhouse Dillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS KADIAN, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Sherry Ann Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corporation
Represented By: Margaret Marcia Schuchardt
Represented By: Daniel I. Schlessinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Sherry Ann Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: Sherry Ann Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois Public Risk Fund
Represented By: Rafey S. Balabanian
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Alfred Kirkland Murray, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?