Malden v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Cheryl Malden
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Federal National Mortgage Association, Real Property Management, Federal Mortgage Association, Brian Moynihan, Timothy Moyopoulous and Fannie Mae
Case Number: 1:2019cv03226
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing and motion hearing held on 7/9/2019. Motion to Dismiss #5 is terminated. Response to motion to dismiss #11 due by 8/14/2019; reply due by 8/28/2019. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by David F Pustilnik for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #11 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/9/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Pustilnik, David)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Federal Mortgage Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Foreclosure Docket), #2 Exhibit B (State Foreclosure Complaint), #3 Exhibit C (Assignment of Mortgage), #4 Exhibit D (Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale), #5 Exhibit E (Order Approving Foreclosure Sale))(Pustilnik, David)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court sets this case for a status hearing on 7/9/2019 at 9:30 AM in Judge Kennelly's courtroom (Room 2188). Plaintiff Cheryl Malden is ordered to appear at the status hearing. If plaintiff does not appear, the Court may dismiss her case. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED complaint by Cheryl Malden against Bank of America, N.A., Federal Mortgage Association, Brian Moynihan, Timothy Moyopoulous (Exhibits) (sxb, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 5/23/2019. Amended complaint to be filed by 6/13/2019. Motion to dismiss #5 is entered and continued to a status hearing set for 7/9/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Cheryl Malden (sxb, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by David F Pustilnik for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #5 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/23/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Pustilnik, David)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Federal Mortgage Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Foreclosure Docket), #2 Exhibit B (State Court Foreclosure Complaint), #3 Exhibit C (Assignment of Mortgage), #4 Exhibit D (Judgment of Foreclosure), #5 Exhibit E (Order Approving Sale))(Pustilnik, David)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (sxb, )
May 13, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ew, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Federal National Mortgage Association by David F Pustilnik (Pustilnik, David)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Pustilnik, David)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2019L002843) filed by Bank of America, N.A. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15820286. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pustilnik, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malden v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Malden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: David F Pustilnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: David F Pustilnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Mortgage Association
Represented By: David F Pustilnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Moynihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Moyopoulous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fannie Mae
Represented By: David F Pustilnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?