Dabbs v. Chicago Transit Authority

Plaintiff: Carnell Dabbs
Defendant: Chicago Transit Authority
Case Number: 1:2019cv03228
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendants motion to dismiss the complaint of employment discrimination #15 as follows: Plaintiff to respond by 7/31/2019. Defendant to reply by 8/14/2019. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/18/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Status hearing set for 7/25/2019 is stricken. No appearance required on 7/10/2019 or 7/25/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by Chicago Transit Authority in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #15 (Gregory, Kristina)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Chicago Transit Authority (Gregory, Kristina)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Kristina Marie Gregory for presentment of before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 7/10/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Gregory, Kristina)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chicago Transit Authority by Kristina Marie Gregory (Gregory, Kristina)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Marshals Service as to Chicago Transit Authority on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (ek, )
May 24, 2019 SUMMONS Issued along with the USM 285 form, certified copy of order dated 5/23/2019 to the U.S. Marshal's Office for service as to Defendant Chicago Transit Authority (ek, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 COMPLAINT filed by Carnell Dabbs. (ek, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion for attorney representation #5 is denied without prejudice to refiling at a later date. Status hearing set for 7/25/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (reg)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. Mailed notice (reg)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Carnell Dabbs for attorney representation (ek, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Carnell Dabbs for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ek, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Carnell Dabbs (ek, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (ek, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and one copy by Carnell Dabbs (ek, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dabbs v. Chicago Transit Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Transit Authority
Represented By: Kristina Marie Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carnell Dabbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?