Knowles v. The Adler Planetarium

Plaintiff: Carlton Knowles
Defendant: THE ADLER PLANETARIUM
Case Number: 1:2019cv03246
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Agreed joint motion for continuation of status hearing and related deadlines #6 is granted. Status hearing set for 7/2/2019 is cancelled and reset to 8/14/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint status report is now due 8/12/2019. Out-of-state counsel may participate by telephone by calling the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Notice of motion date of 7/2/2019 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Kevin Andrew Fritz for presentment of motion to continue #6 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 7/2/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Fritz, Kevin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendant The Adler Planetarium to continue Agreed-To Joint Motion for Continuation of Status Hearing and Related Deadlines (Fritz, Kevin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Adler Planetarium by Kevin Andrew Fritz (Fritz, Kevin)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Carlton Knowles. The Adler Planetarium waiver sent on 5/28/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Lee, C.K.)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 7/2/2019 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 14, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant THE ADLER PLANETARIUM (rc, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
May 14, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ew, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Carlton Knowles; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15823238. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lee, C.K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knowles v. The Adler Planetarium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton Knowles
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ADLER PLANETARIUM
Represented By: Kevin Andrew Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?