Laborers' Pension Fund and Laborers Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Department of the Construction and General Laborers' District Counsel of Chicago and Vicinity et al v. Husar Abatement, Ltd.

Plaintiff: The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus and Laborers' Pension Fund and Laborers Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Department of the Construction and General Laborers' District Counsel of Chicago and Vicinity
Defendant: Husar Abatement, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03309
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1131
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the Plaintiff's request, the status hearing set for 7/1/2019 #10 is stricken and re-set for 8/6/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The status hearing set for 7/1/2019 #8 is stricken and re-set for 8/8/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Laborers' Pension Fund and Laborers Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Department of the Construction and General Laborers' District Counsel of Chicago and Vicinity, Catherine Wenskus, The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund. Husar Abatement, Ltd. waiver sent on 5/29/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. Waiver of service due by 7/29/2019. (Engelhardt, Karen) (Docket text modified on 6/3/2019 by Clerk's Office ).
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 7/1/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Husar Abatement, Ltd. by Kathleen Marie Cahill (Cahill, Kathleen)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Husar Abatement, Ltd. by Megan Marie Moore (Moore, Megan)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Husar Abatement, Ltd. by Todd Abraham Miller (Miller, Todd)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
May 16, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Husar Abatement, Ltd. (ew, )
May 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Catherine Wenskus, Laborers' Pension Fund and Laborers Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Department of the Construction and General Laborers' District Counsel of Chicago and Vicinity, The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund by Karen I. Engelhardt (Engelhardt, Karen)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Engelhardt, Karen)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Laborers' Pension Fund and Laborers Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Department of the Construction and General Laborers' District Counsel of Chicago and Vicinity, Catherine Wenskus, The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15834011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Engelhardt, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laborers' Pension Fund and Laborers Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Department of the Construction and General Laborers' District Counsel of Chicago and Vicinity et al v. Husar Abatement, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Karen I. Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Wenskus
Represented By: Karen I. Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers' Pension Fund and Laborers Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Department of the Construction and General Laborers' District Counsel of Chicago and Vicinity
Represented By: Karen I. Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Husar Abatement, Ltd.
Represented By: Todd Abraham Miller
Represented By: Megan Marie Moore
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?