Hamann GmbH v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Plaintiff: HAMANN GmbH
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Case Number: 1:2019cv03332
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 28 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/9/2019. Mailed notice(vcf, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status and motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #21 is granted. Status hearing is set for 8/6/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
June 29, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith)
June 27, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hamann GmbH as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Vogt, Keith)
June 25, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: On Court's own motion, motion hearing set for 7/2/2019 is reset to 7/9/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (vcf, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #21 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/2/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
June 24, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM by Hamann GmbH in support of motion for preliminary injunction #21 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of KVogt)(Vogt, Keith)
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION by Plaintiff Hamann GmbH for preliminary injunction (Vogt, Keith)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Plaintiff's motion to extend the Temporary Restraining order through and until 7/2/2019 #18 is granted. Status hearing set for 6/18/2019 is reset to 7/9/2019 at 9:30 AM. Motion hearing set for 6/18/2019 is stricken, no appearance is required. Mailed notice (vcf, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of extension of time #18 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 6/18/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
June 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Plaintiff Hamann GmbH for extension of time (Vogt, Keith)
June 13, 2019 Filing 17 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000 posted by Hamann GmbH. (DOCUMENT NOT IMAGED) (jh, )
June 4, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A." (ew, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 16 SEALED Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 6/4/2019. Mailed notice(vcf, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #9 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to exceed page limitation #10 is granted. Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary transfer of the defendant domain named, a temporary asst restraint, expedited discovery, and service of process by email and/or electronic publication 11 is granted. Status hearing is set for 6/18/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Motion for presentment of #9 #10 11 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for leave to file #9 , motion for leave to file excess pages #10 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 6/4/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Hamann GmbH Sealed Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Christian Zierhut regarding memorandum in support of motion #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, Part 1, #2 Exhibit 2, Part 2, #3 Exhibit 2, Part 3, #4 Exhibit 2, Part 4)(Vogt, Keith)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF 11 EX PARTE MOTION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #2 Exhibit 1-6 to Declaration of KVogt, #3 Declaration of Christian Zierhut, #4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of CZierhut)(Vogt, Keith)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Hamann GmbH for leave to file excess pages (Vogt, Keith)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Hamann GmbH for leave to file [Certain] Documents Under Seal (Vogt, Keith)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Hamann GmbH Schedule A to Complaint (Vogt, Keith)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (tt, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (tt, )
May 17, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff HAMANN GmbH by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff HAMANN GmbH by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff HAMANN GmbH by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by HAMANN GmbH; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15837288. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 trademark)(Vogt, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamann GmbH v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAMANN GmbH
Represented By: Yanling Jiang
Represented By: Keith A. Vogt
Represented By: Yi Bu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?