Gress v. Employee Awareness Association, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Dr. William P. Gress and William P. Gress
Defendant: John Does 1-10 and Employee Awareness Association, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03339
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS Report Initial Status Report by William P. Gress (Kolbus, Heather)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. On the Court's own Motion, Initial Status hearing set for 7/18/2019 is reset for 8/7/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 7/18/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 7/15/2019. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William P. Gress as to Employee Awareness Association, LLC on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Kolbus, Heather)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
May 17, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Employee Awareness Association, LLC. (ew, )
May 17, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dr. William P. Gress by Heather A. Kolbus (Kolbus, Heather)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dr. William P. Gress by Cathleen M. Combs (Combs, Cathleen)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dr. William P. Gress by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dr. William P. Gress; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15838043. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Edelman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gress v. Employee Awareness Association, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employee Awareness Association, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. William P. Gress
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Represented By: Heather A. Kolbus
Represented By: Cathleen M. Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William P. Gress
Represented By: Heather A. Kolbus
Represented By: Cathleen M. Combs
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?