Lust v. LTF Club Management Company, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Miracle Lust
Defendant: LFT Club Operations Company, Inc., d/b/a Life Time Fitness, Shqipe Lekaj, individually, LTF Club Management Company, LLC and Shqipe Lekaj
Case Number: 1:2019cv03344
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: Defendants to answer or otherwise plead to the amended complaint by 7/30/2019. The parties are directed to file the joint status report by 8/1/2019. The status hearing set for 7/17/2019 is stricken and reset to 8/7/2019 at 9:45 a.m. (rao, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Miracle Lust against LFT Club Operations Company, Inc., Shqipe Lekaj (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Billhorn, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:Defendant Shqipe Lekaj's uncontested motion for extension of time to answer or respond to Plaintiff's complaint #14 is granted. Defendant Lekaj is given until 7/10/2019 to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint. The motion hearing set for 7/2/2019 is stricken. (rao, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 UNCONTESTED NOTICE of Motion by Erika Anne Dirk for presentment of extension of time #14 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 7/2/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Dirk, Erika)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 UNCONTESTED MOTION by Defendant Shqipe Lekaj for extension of time to Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Dirk, Erika)(Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 6/26/2019 (aee, ).
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shqipe Lekaj by Erika Anne Dirk (Dirk, Erika)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:Defendant LTF Club Management Company, LLC's uncontested motion for extension of time to answer or respond to Plaintiffs' complaint #10 is granted. Defendants to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs' complaint by 7/10/2019. The motion hearing set for 6/12/2019 is stricken. (rao, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Anne Siebert for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #10 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 6/12/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Siebert, Melissa)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant LFT Club Operations Company, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or respond to Complaint - UNCONTESTED (Siebert, Melissa)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant LFT Club Operations Company, Inc. by Erika Anne Dirk (Dirk, Erika)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant LFT Club Operations Company, Inc. by Melissa Anne Siebert (Siebert, Melissa)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of $400.00, receipt no. 26HHMGSB, (Attachments: #1 Group Exhibit A)(Billhorn, John)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 7/12/2019. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 7/17/2019 at 9:45 a.m. (rao, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miracle Lust as to LFT Club Operations Company, Inc. on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Billhorn, John)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, )
May 17, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant LFT Club Operations Company, Inc. (ew, )
May 17, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Miracle Lust by John William Billhorn (Billhorn, John)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Billhorn, John)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT MIRACLE LUST, on behalf of herself, and all other plaintiffs similarly situated, known and unknown, v. LFT CLUB OPERATIONS COMPANY, INC., d/b/a LIFETIME FITNESS BURR RIDGE, AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION AND SHQIPE LEKAJ, INDIVIDUALLY filed by Miracle Lust; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15839063. (Attachments: #1 Miracle Lust - Consent To Sue)(Billhorn, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lust v. LTF Club Management Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LFT Club Operations Company, Inc., d/b/a Life Time Fitness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shqipe Lekaj, individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTF Club Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Melissa Anne Siebert
Represented By: Erika Anne Dirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shqipe Lekaj
Represented By: Erika Anne Dirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miracle Lust
Represented By: John William Billhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?