Morales v. Napleton's Schaumburg Subaru, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joya I. Morales
Defendant: Napleton Schaumburg Motors, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Napleton's Schaumburg Subaru, Inc. and Joseph T. Snyder & Associates, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03348
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS Report by Joya I. Morales (Saranteas, James)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joya I. Morales. Napleton's Schaumburg Subaru, Inc. waiver sent on 5/18/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Saranteas, James)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joya I. Morales Rule 41 Notice of Dismissal of Certain Allegations as to METLIFE Only (Saranteas, James)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joya I. Morales. Napleton Schaumburg Motors, Inc. waiver sent on 5/18/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Saranteas, James)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joya I. Morales. Joseph T. Snyder & Associates, Ltd. waiver sent on 5/18/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Saranteas, James)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joya I. Morales. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 5/18/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Saranteas, James)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Initial status hearing set for 7/17/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
May 17, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Saranteas, James)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joya I. Morales by James Saranteas (Saranteas, James)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joya I. Morales; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15839631. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A through B)(Saranteas, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales v. Napleton's Schaumburg Subaru, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joya I. Morales
Represented By: James Saranteas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Napleton Schaumburg Motors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Napleton's Schaumburg Subaru, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph T. Snyder & Associates, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?