Peak v. Laborers Union Local #1 et al
Plaintiff: Bobby P Peak, II
Defendant: Leo Esparza, Peter Fosco, Marty Flanagan, Mike Pagano, Laborers Union Local #1 and Frank Damato
Case Number: 1:2019cv03351
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 SUMMONS Issued, 6 Original with certified copy of Order dated 7/8/19 and USM-285 forms as to Defendants Frank Damato, Leo Esparza, Marty Flanagan, Peter Fosco, Laborers Union Local #1 and Mike Pagano, to U.S. Marshal for service via email. (gcy, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 COMPLAINT filed by Bobby P Peak, II; Jury Demand. (gcy, )
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Status hearing held. Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. The Clerk's Office is to issue summons. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons. Plaintiff shall complete a USM-285 form for each defendant being served, if he has not done so. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff is referred to seek assistance at the Hibbler Help Desk. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/8/2019. Mailed Notice.(gcy, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Case called for a status on 6/10/2019 as to plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 and motion for attorney representation #4 . No one appeared nor called the court. The status hearing is continued to 7/8/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing on plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 and motion for attorney representation #4 is set for 6/10/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Bobby P Peak, II (bg, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Bobby P Peak, II for attorney representation (bg, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Bobby P Peak, II for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (bg, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (bg, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 5 copies by Bobby P Peak, II (bg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peak v. Laborers Union Local #1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Esparza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Fosco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pagano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laborers Union Local #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Damato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby P Peak, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?