Cohan v. Northern Majestic Hotel, LLC
Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Defendant: Northern Majestic Hotel, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03358
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file its answer or responsive pleading to the complaint and to vacate any technical defaults #8 is granted. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 7/29/2019. The parties are directed to file the joint status report by 8/2/2019. The status hearing set for 7/16/2019 is stricken and reset to 8/7/2019 at 9:45 a.m. The motion hearing set for 7/16/2019 is stricken. (rao, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Rachel L Schaller for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #8 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 7/16/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Schaller, Rachel)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Northern Majestic Hotel, LLC for extension of time to file answer or Responsive Pleading to the Complaint and to Vacate Any Technical Defaults (Schaller, Rachel)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Northern Majestic Hotel, LLC by Rachel L Schaller (Schaller, Rachel)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 7/10/2019. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 7/16/2019 at 9:45 a.m. (rao, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Howard Cohan as to Northern Majestic Hotel, LLC on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Burt, Marshall)
May 20, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Northern Majestic Hotel, LLC (pj, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
May 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Howard Cohan by Marshall J. Burt (Burt, Marshall)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Burt, Marshall)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Howard Cohan; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15840749.(Burt, Marshall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohan v. Northern Majestic Hotel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Cohan
Represented By: Marshall J. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Majestic Hotel, LLC
Represented By: Rachel L Schaller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?