Herren v. Amsted Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Amber Herren
Defendant: Amsted Industries, Inc., d/b/a Burgess-Norton Mfg. Co., Inc. and Amsted Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03359
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Named Parties Listed in Plaintiff's Complaint #13 is granted. Plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint on or before August 2, 2019. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 7/15/2019. Mailed notice(gcy, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY by Amber Herren to response to motion, #15 to Amend (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Kane, Lisa)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion hearing held on 6/28/2019. Plaintiff is given 21 days to file a Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Named Parties #13 . A status hearing is set for 7/26/2019 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ewf, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE by Amsted Industries, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Amber Herren to amend/correct the Named Parties Listed in Plaintiff's Complaint #13 Redacted-Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Named Parties Listed in Plaintiff's Complaint (McFetridge, Jane)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE by Amsted Industries, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Amber Herren to amend/correct the Named Parties Listed in Plaintiff's Complaint #13 DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE NAMED PARTIES LISTED IN PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (McFetridge, Jane)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Lisa R. Kane for presentment of motion to amend/correct #13 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 6/28/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Kane, Lisa)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Amber Herren to amend/correct the Named Parties Listed in Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kane, Lisa)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Amsted Industries, Inc. LOCAL RULE 3.2 AND FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANT BURGESS-NORTON MANUFACTURING CO., INC. (McFetridge, Jane)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Amsted Industries, Inc.(McFetridge, Jane)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint #9 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, June 7, 2019. An Agreed Written Status Report is due on 8/21/2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply as to notice of motion #8 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (McFetridge, Jane)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION NOTICE of Motion by Jane M. McFetridge for presentment of before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 6/7/2019 at 09:30 AM. (McFetridge, Jane)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc. by Priya Prakash Khatkhate ATTORNEY APPEARANCE (Khatkhate, Priya)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc. by Jane M. McFetridge ATTORNEY APPEARANCE (McFetridge, Jane)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amber Herren by Nicky M Priovolos (Priovolos, Nicky)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amber Herren as to Amsted Industries, Inc. on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Kane, Lisa)
May 22, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc. (rc, )
May 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amber Herren by Lisa R. Kane (Kane, Lisa)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kane, Lisa)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Amber Herren; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15840841.(Kane, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herren v. Amsted Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amsted Industries, Inc., d/b/a Burgess-Norton Mfg. Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amsted Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Priya Prakash Khatkhate
Represented By: Jane M. McFetridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Herren
Represented By: Lisa R. Kane
Represented By: Nicky M Priovolos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?