Abu Jbareh v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Plaintiff: Jihad Abu Jbareh and Margaret Wangler
Defendant: uscis, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv03361
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Treacy, Elizabeth)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Jihad Abu Jbareh, Margaret Wangler regarding Summons and Complaint served on US Attorney's Office on 5/29/2019 (Michael, Alexander)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Jihad Abu Jbareh, Margaret Wangler regarding Summons and Complaint served on USCIS on 5/29/2019 (Michael, Alexander)
May 20, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (pj, )
May 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Michael, Alexander)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jihad Abu Jbareh; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15841221.(Michael, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abu Jbareh v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: uscis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jihad Abu Jbareh
Represented By: Alexander Albert Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Wangler
Represented By: Alexander Albert Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?