Sovereign Tap, LLC et al v. Norview Builders, Inc.
Appellee: Norview Builders, Inc.
Appellant: Dale Lewis, Jessica Watson, Rafael Gomez and Sovereign Tap, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03363
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan H Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Motion to continue status hearing #9 is granted. Status hearing set for 7/9/2019 is stricken and reset to 7/31/2019 at 9:30 a.m. By agreement of the parties, deadlines are stayed until the next status hearing. Mailed notice (ags, )
June 28, 2019 MOTION by Appellant Sovereign Tap, LLC to stay proceedings (Omitted relief from motion #9 ) (pk, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Konstantinos T. Sparagis for presentment of motion to continue #9 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 7/9/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Sparagis, Konstantinos)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Appellants Rafael Gomez, Dale Lewis, Sovereign Tap, LLC, Jessica Watson to continue status date set for July 9, 2019 to July 31, 2019 and stay proceedings (Sparagis, Konstantinos)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellants Rafael Gomez, Dale Lewis, Sovereign Tap, LLC, Jessica Watson by Konstantinos T. Sparagis (Sparagis, Konstantinos)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSCRIPT OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS held on 5/1/2019 regarding Notice of Appeal #6 . (To view an image of this document please visit the Bankruptcy Court docket.) (USBC-Ross, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Appellant/Appellee Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(USBC-Ross, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Status hearing held. The Court has a conflict with the next status date given at the hearing, and so it advances it to 7/9/2019 at 11:00 a.m. for a report on settlement. Mailed notice (ags, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Initial status hearing is set for 6/12/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 E-MAILED Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) to Konstantinos Sparagis (las, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 E-MAILED Rule 83.16 letter to Konstantinos Sparagis (las, )
May 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 18 B 1825 (Judge Cox) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sovereign Tap, LLC et al v. Norview Builders, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Norview Builders, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Kimball Paulsen
Represented By: William Jeffrey Factor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Dale Lewis
Represented By: Konstantinos T. Sparagis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jessica Watson
Represented By: Konstantinos T. Sparagis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rafael Gomez
Represented By: Konstantinos T. Sparagis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sovereign Tap, LLC
Represented By: Konstantinos T. Sparagis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?