United States of America v. Subway Real Estate, LLC
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Subway Real Estate, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03387
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS Report by United States of America (Heffron, Scott)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Subway Real Estate, LLC(Johnson, Patrick)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's motion for leave to file answer instanter #5 is granted. Defendant is directed to file its answer as a separate docket entry. Motion presentment hearing set for 7/2/2019 is stricken. Defendant is reminded to review the court's website regarding dates when the court is in session before filing any further motions. The parties are to file a joint status report on this court's form and deliver a courtesy copy to chambers by 7/16/2019. This matter is set for a status hearing on 7/23/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Form) (cn).
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Subway Real Estate, LLC by James T. Rohlfing (Rohlfing, James)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick J Johnson for presentment of motion for leave to file #5 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/2/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Johnson, Patrick)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendant Subway Real Estate, LLC for leave to file Answer Instanter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Patrick)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Subway Real Estate, LLC by Patrick J Johnson (Johnson, Patrick)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to Subway Real Estate, LLC on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Heffron, Scott) (Docket Text Modified on 6/5/2019) (ek, ).
May 21, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Subway Real Estate, LLC (rc, )
May 21, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Heffron, Scott)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A, B and C)(Heffron, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Subway Real Estate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subway Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Patrick J Johnson
Represented By: James T. Rohlfing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Scott Dennis Heffron
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?