Blackburn v. AIM Integrated Logistics, Inc., a foreign corporation
Plaintiff: Kendrick Blackburn
Defendant: AIM Integrated Logistics, Inc., a foreign corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv03388
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by AIM Integrated Logistics, Inc., a foreign corporation (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Poulakidas, Mark)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 7/29/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by 7/15/2019. MIDP disclosures shall be served by 8/14/2019. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 7/1/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (nsf, )
May 21, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by AIM Integrated Logistics, Inc., a foreign corporation re notice of removal, #1 , attorney appearance #6 , attorney appearance #5 , attorney appearance #3 , civil cover sheet #2 , attorney appearance #4 (Poulakidas, Mark)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AIM Integrated Logistics, Inc., a foreign corporation by John Bernard Racanelli (Racanelli, John)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AIM Integrated Logistics, Inc., a foreign corporation by Michael Lewis Abel (Abel, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AIM Integrated Logistics, Inc., a foreign corporation by James Robert Studnicka (Studnicka, James)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AIM Integrated Logistics, Inc., a foreign corporation by Mark George Poulakidas (Poulakidas, Mark)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Poulakidas, Mark)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (19-L-003332) filed by AIM Integrated Logistics, Inc., a foreign corporation Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15844992. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Poulakidas, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackburn v. AIM Integrated Logistics, Inc., a foreign corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIM Integrated Logistics, Inc., a foreign corporation
Represented By: Michael Lewis Abel
Represented By: Mark George Poulakidas
Represented By: James Robert Studnicka
Represented By: John Bernard Racanelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendrick Blackburn
Represented By: David A. Rabinowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?