Franks v. Habitat Company, The
Plaintiff: Nat Franks
Defendant: Habitat Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv03438
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Briefing schedule set as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #7 . Response due by 7/29/2019. Reply due by 8/5/2019. Status Hearing set for 9/30/2019 at 9:00 AM. Initial Status hearing set for 8/12/2019 at 9:00 AM stands. Motion hearing set for 7/23/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Habitat Company by Sarah J. Gasperini APPEARANCE (Gasperini, Sarah)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Habitat Company by Neil Hunter Dishman APPEARANCE (Dishman, Neil)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by Habitat Company in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #7 DEFENDANT'S MEMO IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS (Dishman, Neil)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 DEFENDANT'S NOTICE of Motion by Neil Hunter Dishman for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #7 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/23/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Dishman, Neil)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Habitat Company DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (Dishman, Neil)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nat Franks as to Habitat Company on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Greenberg, Robert)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 8/12/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 8/7/2019. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nat Franks by Matthew Scott Jarka (Jarka, Matthew)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nat Franks by Robert B. Greenberg (Greenberg, Robert)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, )
May 22, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Habitat Company (ec, )
May 22, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Nat Franks; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15853566. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Jarka, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franks v. Habitat Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nat Franks
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jarka
Represented By: Robert B. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Habitat Company
Represented By: Sarah J. Gasperini
Represented By: Neil Hunter Dishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?