United States of America v. Funds in the amount of $130,000 United States Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Funds in the amount of $53,000 and Funds in the amount of $130,000 United States Currency
Case Number: 1:2019cv03440
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:0881
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Status hearing held on 7/15/2019 and continued to 9/25/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 WARRANT for Arrest in Rem Received and Executed by the U.S. Marshal Service on 6/12/2019. (jh, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by All Defendants Notice of Filing Verified Answer (Ciardelli, Victor)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE by Defendant Funds in the amount of $53,000 Verified Answer to Complaint (Ciardelli, Victor)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE by Defendant Funds in the amount of $130,000 United States Currency Verified Answer to Complaint (Ciardelli, Victor)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Funds in the amount of $130,000 United States Currency, Funds in the amount of $53,000 by Victor F. Ciardelli (Ciardelli, Victor)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 Appearance by Funds in the amount of $130,000 United States Currency, Funds in the amount of $53,000 (Ciardelli, Victor)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 WITHDRAWING Jeffrey R. Borup as counsel for Plaintiff United States of America and substituting Brian Hayes as counsel of record (Hayes, Brian)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: At the government's request, the status hearing previously set for 6/13/2019 is stricken and reset for 7/15/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Status hearing set for 6/13/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (reg)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 ARREST WARRANT issued as to In Rem for the FUNDS IN THE AMOUNT OF $130,000 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY and FUNDS IN THE AMOUNT OF $53,000 (aee, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Ronald "Mark" Brunzie regarding complaint #1 (Borup, Jeffrey)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Jeffrey Ryan Borup as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff United States of America (Borup, Jeffrey)
May 22, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Borup, Jeffrey)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture filed by United States of America; Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Text photos)(Borup, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Funds in the amount of $130,000 United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funds in the amount of $53,000
Represented By: Victor F. Ciardelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funds in the amount of $130,000 United States Currency
Represented By: Victor F. Ciardelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jeffrey Ryan Borup
Represented By: Brian Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?