Strike 3 Holdings v. John Doe
Plaintiff: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.15.248.125 and Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv03699
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Plaintiff's motion #8 to issue early subpoena to the ISP is granted in light of the need to identify the Doe Defendant. Plaintiff shall promptly serve the subpoena and follow-up on enforcement if the ISP does not respond by 30 days after service. The status hearing of 07/18/2019 is reset to 08/08/2019 at 9:15 a.m., with the initial status report, R. 7, due by 08/05/2019. Emailed notice (slb, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference NOTICE of Motion by Timothy Robert Herman for presentment of motion for leave to file,,,,, #8 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 7/2/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Herman, Timothy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC for leave to file Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, #2 Notice of Filing Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, #3 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, #4 Exhibit A-Declaration of Greg Lansky in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, #5 Exhibit B-Declaration of Tobias Fieser in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, #6 Exhibit C-Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, #7 Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference)(Herman, Timothy)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 07/18/2019 at 10:00 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (rp, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (rp, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Herman, Timothy)
June 3, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC by Timothy Robert Herman (Herman, Timothy)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Herman, Timothy)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15889813. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Herman, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings v. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.15.248.125
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Robert Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?