Village Green Management Company v. Robinson
Plaintiff: Village Green Management Company
Defendant: Dawn Joi Robinson and All Unknown Occupants
Case Number: 1:2019cv03753
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: In a status hearing on July 12, 2019, the Court made reference to a case that may have certain similarities to the case at hand. The Court was referring to United States of America v. Angelina Lyles, 05-CR-426. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on July 12, 2019. Mailed notice (ph, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion hearing held on 7/12/2019. Response to motion to remand #6 is due on or before 7/26/2019. Reply is due on or before 8/2/2019. Status hearing is set for 8/23/2019 at 09:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ewf, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Christopher Randall Johnson for presentment of motion to remand #6 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 7/12/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Johnson, Christopher)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Village Green Management Company to remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Eviction Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Letter)(Johnson, Christopher)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Village Green Management Company by Christopher Randall Johnson (Johnson, Christopher)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service by Nancy Lee Carlson on behalf of Dawn Joi Robinson (Carlson, Nancy Lee)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Dawn Joi Robinson (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing notice to cook county clerk of courts of removal)(Carlson, Nancy Lee)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 MAILED notice of removal letter to Cary Gregg Schiff (las, )
June 5, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ew, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15897788. (Carlson, Nancy Lee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Village Green Management Company v. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Joi Robinson
Represented By: Nancy Lee Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Unknown Occupants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village Green Management Company
Represented By: Cary Gregg Schiff
Represented By: Christopher Randall Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?