Woodruff v. Wheeler Financial, Inc.
Appellant: Christina Woodruff
Appellee: Wheeler Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03770
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS held on 7/19/2018, 8/9/2018, 9/20/2018, 11/8/2018, 1/10/2019, 2/7/2019, 3/28/2019, 5/2/2019, 5/9/2019, 5/23/2019, 6/13/2019, 6/20/2019 regarding Notice of Appeal #7 . (To view an image of this document please visit the Bankruptcy Court docket.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Transmittal Letter)(USBC-Ross, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Appellant/Appellee Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(USBC-Ross, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service by Appellee Wheeler Financial, Inc. regarding attorney appearance #5 , attorney appearance #4 (Doyle, David)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee Wheeler Financial, Inc. by David Richard Doyle (Doyle, David)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee Wheeler Financial, Inc. by Robert Michael Fishman (Fishman, Robert)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Transmittal Letter NOA)(USBC-Gonzalez, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letter) (bg, )
June 6, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 17 B 18780 (Judge Barnes) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter NOA, #3 BK Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 In Forma Pauperis)(USBC-Gonzalez, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodruff v. Wheeler Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Christina Woodruff
Represented By: Adam Benjamin Bourdette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wheeler Financial, Inc.
Represented By: David Richard Doyle
Represented By: Robert Michael Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?