Johnson v. Walsh et al
Plaintiff: James Daniel Johnson
Defendant: Walsh
Case Number: 1:2019cv03774
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT Explaining $975 by James Daniel Johnson (Envelope postmark 07/22/2019) (Document contains the incorrect case number) (pj, )
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court will address Plaintiff's in forma pauperis applications in Case Nos. 19 C 3774 and 19 C 4252 together, as they raise identical concerns. Plaintiff's applications ( #3 in both cases) are entered and continued. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with these cases, he must file, by August 12, 2019, a statement explaining why the $975 he received on September 20, 2018, should not be counted against his ability to prepay the full filing fees in both cases. Alternatively, Plaintiff may prepay the $400 filing fees for both cases. In addition, Plaintiff recently entered into a settlement agreement in Johnson v. Baldwin, Case No. 17 C 8790 (N.D. Ill.) (Kennelly, J.). Because the settlement may have a bearing on his request to proceed in forma pauperis in the two new cases and may affect his eligibility to continue to pay the fees in his other cases in installments, Plaintiff must disclose the amount of money he expects to receive. Once the Court receives Plaintiff's filing, it will order it placed under seal because the amount of the settlement is not public. If Plaintiff does not comply with these directives by August 12, 2019, the Court will summarily dismiss Case Nos. 19 C 3774 and 19 C 4252. Plaintiff is reminded that he must promptly submit a change-of address notification if he is released or transferred to another facility. If he does not keep the Clerk apprised of his correct address, all of his pending cases before this Court will be subject to dismissal. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/15/2019. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from James Daniel Johnson dated 5/31/2019 (Exhibit). (mc, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff James Daniel Johnson for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits) (mc, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (mc, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 1 copy by James Daniel Johnson. (Exhibits). (mc, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/6/2019: #1 Envelope postmarked 6/3/2019) (mc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Walsh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Daniel Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?