Phoenix Closures, Inc. v. High Road Craft Ice Cream, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Phoenix Closures, Inc.
Defendant: High Road Craft Ice Cream, Inc. and Ciao Bella Gelato Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03780
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Referring Judge: Sidney I Schenkier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/01/2019. (bg, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Initial status hearing held on 8/1/2019. Amended pleadings and joinder of parties due by 11/1/2019. Fact discovery ordered closed by 1/2/2020. NO EXTENSIONS. Status hearing set for 1/7/2020 at 09:30 AM. No experts anticipated, if this changes parties are to notify the Court by the end of November. The Court will set a status hearing for scheduling an expert discovery schedule. This case is being referred to a Magistrate Judge for discovery supervision and all discovery motions including protective orders without authority to extend discovery deadlines. Mailed notice (is, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Ciao Bella Gelato Co., Inc.(Duffy, James)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by High Road Craft Ice Cream, Inc.(Duffy, James)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Ciao Bella Gelato Co., Inc., High Road Craft Ice Cream, Inc. by James David Duffy (Duffy, James)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS Report Joint Initial by Phoenix Closures, Inc. (Burke, John)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Defendant Ciao Bella Gelato Co., Inc.'s consent motion for extension of time to respond to complaint, through and including July 30, 2019 #5 is granted. Mailed notice (is, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendant Ciao Bella Gelato Co., Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gevertz, David)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Closures, Inc. regarding Summons/Complaint served on High Road Craft Ice Cream, Inc. on 7/9/2019 (Burke, John)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Phoenix Closures, Inc. regarding Process Server served on Ciao Bella Gelato Co., Inc. on 7/2/2019 (Burke, John)
June 12, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Ciao Bella Gelato Co., Inc., High Road Craft Ice Cream, Inc. (pj, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Initial status hearing set for 8/1/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
June 6, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Phoenix Closures, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15903346. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Burke, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phoenix Closures, Inc. v. High Road Craft Ice Cream, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phoenix Closures, Inc.
Represented By: John David Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Road Craft Ice Cream, Inc.
Represented By: James David Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ciao Bella Gelato Co., Inc.
Represented By: David E. Gevertz
Represented By: James David Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?