Ewing et al v. Carrier et al
Plaintiff: Yasmany Gomez and Randall Ewing
Defendant: Erik Carrier and D'Aprile Properties, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03791
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:No party appeared for today's status hearing. Today's status hearing is stricken and re-set for 8/14/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiffs' motion for jurisdictional discovery #8 is granted. Plaintiffs may serve their proposed written discovery requests on Defendant D'Aprile Properties, LLC.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by All Plaintiffs for presentment of motion for discovery #8 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/10/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Ewing, Randall)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiffs Randall Ewing, Yasmany Gomez for discovery re D'Aprile's citizenship (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ewing, Randall)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for discovery #5 is denied. The proposed interrogatories, which seek the LLC members' respective states of "residency," would not yield the information necessary to ascertain the citizenship of the LLC's members and therefore the citizenship of the LLC. Motion hearing set for 7/8/2019 #6 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by All Plaintiffs for presentment of motion for discovery #5 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/8/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Ewing, Randall)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiffs Randall Ewing, Yasmany Gomez for discovery re D'Aprile's membership (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Interrogatories)(Ewing, Randall)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:By 7/1/2019, Plaintiffs shall file a jurisdictional addendum identifying the members of Defendant D'Aprile Properties LLC and the citizenship of each member. Status hearing set for 7/8/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
June 7, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mora, Steven)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Randall Ewing, Yasmany Gomez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15904619.(Mora, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ewing et al v. Carrier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yasmany Gomez
Represented By: Steven Huntley Mora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Ewing
Represented By: Steven Huntley Mora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D'Aprile Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?