Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Jeanne Johnson and Broken Barrel, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03794
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST For Default against all defendants (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Lonstein, Julie)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. as to Broken Barrel, LLC on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Lonstein, Julie)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. as to Jeanne Johnson on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Lonstein, Julie)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Intiial Discovery Pilot Project by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Lonstein, Julie)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 8/8/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. by Sheldon S. Gomberg (Gomberg, Sheldon)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (mc, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mc, )
June 7, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Broken Barrel, LLC, Jeanne Johnson. (ew, )
June 7, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 Report on the FIling of an Action Regarding Copyright by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Lonstein, Julie)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. by Julie Cohen Lonstein (Lonstein, Julie)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Julie Cohen Lonstein as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Lonstein, Julie)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Lonstein, Julie)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to complaint #1 Exhibits A-Advertisements to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Facebook Advertisement)(Lonstein, Julie)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15904763. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lonstein, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broken Barrel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Represented By: Sheldon S. Gomberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?