Scapa North America, Inc. v. Hall et al
Plaintiff: Scapa North America, Inc.
Defendant: David Hall and Adhesive Coating Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03828
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE by Scapa North America, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Adhesive Coating Technologies, Inc. to dismiss Count III, IV, and VI #29 (Mason, Lawrence)
August 5, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE by Scapa North America, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant David Hall to dismiss Count I of Plaintiff's Complaint #27 (Mason, Lawrence)
July 22, 2019 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to withdraw #33 is granted. John Lee is terminated as counsel of record. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Motion by Lawrence David Mason for presentment of motion to withdraw #33 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 7/31/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Mason, Lawrence)
July 22, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION by Plaintiff Scapa North America, Inc. to withdraw attorney (Mason, Lawrence)
July 18, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of Service Defendant ACT response to Plaintiff's Request to Admit by Elleni Kalouris on behalf of Adhesive Coating Technologies, Inc. (Kalouris, Elleni)
July 15, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION by Defendant Adhesive Coating Technologies, Inc.To Adopt AND CONFORM APPLICABLE MOTIONS OF CO-DEFENDANT DAVID HALL (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kalouris, Elleni)
July 15, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM of ACT in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Declaration of P. Poulos, #2 Certificate of Service)(Kalouris, Elleni)
July 15, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION by Defendant Adhesive Coating Technologies, Inc. to dismiss Count III, IV, and VI (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kalouris, Elleni)
July 15, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM by David Hall in support of motion to dismiss #27 Count I of Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of David Hall, #2 Exhibit B - Second Declaration of David Hall, #3 Exhibit C - Table of IL Federal and State Court Decisions)(Burbrink, Brian)
July 15, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION by Defendant David Hall to dismiss Count I of Plaintiff's Complaint (Burbrink, Brian)
July 12, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time to answer #22 is granted, and defendants must answer the complaint by 8/23/19. The motion for expedited discovery #24 is granted. No appearance on 7/16/19 is necessary. Status hearing remains set for 8/27/19 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by John A Drake for presentment of motion for discovery #24 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 7/16/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Drake, John)
July 10, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION by Defendants Adhesive Coating Technologies, Inc., David Hall for discovery - Expedited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiff)(Drake, John)
July 8, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by John A Drake for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #22 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 7/16/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Drake, John)
July 8, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION by Defendants Adhesive Coating Technologies, Inc., David Hall for extension of time to file answer (Drake, John)
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Service [re: first set of written discovery to Defendants] by Lawrence David Mason on behalf of Scapa North America, Inc. (Mason, Lawrence)
June 25, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Motion hearing held. Defendants' responsive motions to dismiss are due 7/15/19. No notices of presentment are necessary. Plaintiff's response is due 8/5/19; defendants' replies 8/19/19. For the reasons stated in open court, plaintiff's motion for expedited discovery #7 is granted in part. Plaintiff is authorized to issue written discovery. Responses to discovery shall be made within 30 days. No oral discovery is authorized at this time. An agreed proposed protective order may be submitted to proposed_order_shah@ilnd.uscourts.gov. The motion for preliminary injunction #13 is entered and continued to the status hearing which is set for 8/27/19 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant David Hall by John A Drake (Drake, John)
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant David Hall by Brian David Burbrink (Burbrink, Brian)
June 19, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Adhesive Coating Technologies, Inc., David Hall by Elleni Kalouris (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Kalouris, Elleni)
June 18, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Motion hearing held. Hearing on plaintiff's motion for discovery #7 is entered and continued to 6/25/19 at 9:45 a.m. to coincide with the hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction #13 . Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Lawrence David Mason for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #13 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/25/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Mason, Lawrence)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by Scapa North America, Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #13 (Mason, Lawrence)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Scapa North America, Inc. for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Text of Proposed Order)(Mason, Lawrence)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scapa North America, Inc. as to David Hall on 6/15/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Mason, Lawrence)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scapa North America, Inc. as to Adhesive Coating Technologies, Inc. on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Mason, Lawrence)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Scapa North America, Inc. by John A Lee (Lee, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for leave to file oversized brief #5 is granted. Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Lawrence David Mason for presentment of motion for discovery #7 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/18/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Mason, Lawrence)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Scapa North America, Inc. for discovery [limited, expedited] and to preserve evidence (Mason, Lawrence)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Lawrence David Mason for presentment of motion for leave to file #5 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/18/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Mason, Lawrence)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Scapa North America, Inc. for leave to file overlength brief (Mason, Lawrence)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, )
June 7, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Adhesive Coating Technologies, Inc., David Hall (jjr, )
June 7, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Scapa North America, Inc. (Mason, Lawrence)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Scapa North America, Inc. by Lawrence David Mason (Mason, Lawrence)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND OTHER RELIEF filed by Scapa North America, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15907363. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Non-Compete Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Cease and Desist Letters, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mason, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scapa North America, Inc. v. Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hall
Represented By: Brian David Burbrink
Represented By: John A Drake
Represented By: Elleni Kalouris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adhesive Coating Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Elleni Kalouris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scapa North America, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence David Mason
Represented By: John A Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?