PCM Sales, Inc. v. Key et al
Plaintiff: PCM Sales, Inc.
Defendant: Nathan Key and FlexManage, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03837
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiff FlexManage, Inc.'s unopposed motion to extend time to answer or otherwise plead #18 is granted to 9/16/19. Motion hearing date of 7/23/19 is stricken. Rule 16 conference previously set for 8/21/19 is stricken and re-set to 9/25/19 at 9:00 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff PCM Sales, Inc. by Carly Alana Chocron (Chocron, Carly)
July 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Tal Cohen Chaiken for presentment of extension of time #18 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/23/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Chaiken, Tal)
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant FlexManage, Inc. for extension of time (Unopposed) (Chaiken, Tal)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants FlexManage, Inc., Nathan Key by Tal Cohen Chaiken (Chaiken, Tal)
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by PCM Sales, Inc.. Nathan Key waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Nelson, Kristi)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff PCM Sales, Inc. by Katie M Connolly (Connolly, Katie)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiff's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #13 is granted. Attorney Katie M Connolly is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Plaintiff. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15997603. (Connolly, Katie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff FlexManage, Inc.'s unopposed motion to extend time to answer or otherwise plead #9 is granted to 8/7/19. Status hearing set for 8/12/19 is stricken. The parties are directed to appear through lead counsel for a pretrial conference pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 16 on 8/21/19 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel are requested promptly to meet face-to-face for a discussion of possible settlement and for preparation of a planning report. The form is accessible from the courts Internet site, https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_judges/pallmeyer/Report% 20of%20Planning%20Mtg.pdf. Such report shall be submitted to Judge Pallmeyer in chambers no later than two business days prior to the conference. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff PCM Sales, Inc. by Ryan P Laurie (Laurie, Ryan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Mariangela M. Seale for presentment of extension of time #9 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/1/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Seale, Mariangela)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant FlexManage, Inc. for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Seale, Mariangela)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant FlexManage, Inc. by Mariangela M. Seale (Seale, Mariangela)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant FlexManage, Inc. by Matthew Charles Crowl (Crowl, Matthew)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PCM Sales, Inc. as to FlexManage, Inc. on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Nelson, Kristi)
June 13, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants FlexManage, Inc., Nathan Key (rc, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 8/12/2019 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
June 10, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by PCM Sales, Inc. (Nelson, Kristi)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff PCM Sales, Inc. by Kristi Lynn Nelson (Nelson, Kristi)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Nelson, Kristi)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by PCM Sales, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15908804. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Nelson, Kristi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PCM Sales, Inc. v. Key et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Key
Represented By: Tal Cohen Chaiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FlexManage, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Charles Crowl
Represented By: Tal Cohen Chaiken
Represented By: Mariangela M. Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PCM Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Kristi Lynn Nelson
Represented By: Carly Alana Chocron
Represented By: Katie M Connolly
Represented By: Ryan P Laurie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?