TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. v. Patry's Outdoor Power, LLC et al
Plaintiff: TCF Inventory Finance, Inc.
Defendant: Patry's Outdoor Power, LLC and Robert A. Patry
Case Number: 1:2019cv03840
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Rule 16(b) status hearing held on 8/5/2019 with only plaintiff's attorney. Defendant Patry's Outdoor Power, LLC is held in default for failure to respond to the complaint after service of summons. Status hearing is continued to 9/19/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Plalintiff's attorney is directed to advise defendants of the date for the status hearing. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
August 2, 2019 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Robert A. Patry. (kb, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. as to Patry's Outdoor Power, LLC on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Campbell, Holly)
July 14, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 8/5/2019 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant who has not yet appeared by counsel in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (mk)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. as to Patry's Outdoor Power, LLC on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Bay, William)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. by Holly Hannah Campbell (Campbell, Holly)
June 10, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Robert A. Patry, Patry's Outdoor Power, LLC. (kb, )
June 10, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. by William Robert Bay (Bay, William)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Bay, William)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by TCF Inventory Finance, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15908893. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bay, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. v. Patry's Outdoor Power, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TCF Inventory Finance, Inc.
Represented By: William Robert Bay
Represented By: Holly Hannah Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patry's Outdoor Power, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Patry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?