United States of America v. 286,161 bottles, 209 dietary supplement cookie packs, and 45,521 packs, boxes, or granules, more or less, of an article of food, specifically various herbal supplement capsules, tablets, cookies, and teas
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 286,161 bottles, 209 dietary supplement cookie packs, and 45,521 packs, boxes, or granules, more or less, of an article of food, specifically various herbal supplement capsules, tablets, cookies, and
Claimant: Life Rising Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv03876
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Steven J. Rosenberg for presentment of motion to dismiss #18 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 9/18/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Rosenberg, Steven)
August 8, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Claimant Life Rising Corporation to dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem (Rosenberg, Steven)
July 31, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court strikes the status date set for 8/1/19 and resets it to 9/18/19 at 9:30 a.m. Claimants should notice any motions to dismiss the complaint for 9/18/19. Mailed notice (mw, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 STATUS Report by Life Rising Corporation, United States of America (Ling, Ernest)
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 CLAIM by Life Rising Corporation regarding Defendant Articles (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Benjamin, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Claimant Life Rising Corporation by Melanie Elysia Baker (Baker, Melanie)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Claimant Life Rising Corporation by Robert R. Benjamin (Benjamin, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Claimant Life Rising Corporation by Steven J. Rosenberg (Rosenberg, Steven)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant 286,161 bottles, 209 dietary supplement cookie packs, and 45,521 packs, boxes, or granules, more or less, of an article of food, specifically various herbal supplement capsules, tablets, cookies, and by Melanie Elysia Baker (Baker, Melanie)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant 286,161 bottles, 209 dietary supplement cookie packs, and 45,521 packs, boxes, or granules, more or less, of an article of food, specifically various herbal supplement capsules, tablets, cookies, and by Steven J. Rosenberg (Rosenberg, Steven)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant 286,161 bottles, 209 dietary supplement cookie packs, and 45,521 packs, boxes, or granules, more or less, of an article of food, specifically various herbal supplement capsules, tablets, cookies, and by Robert R. Benjamin (Benjamin, Robert)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 ARREST WARRANT In Rem Returned Executed on 6/14/19 as to 286,161 bottles, 209 dietary supplement cookie packs, and 45,521 packs, boxes, or granules, more or less, of an article of food, specifically various herbal supplement capsules, tablets, cookies, and teas. (kp, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 WARRANT Returned Executed as to Defendants. (Ling, Ernest)
June 17, 2019 WARRANT for arrest in rem issued as to 286,161 bottles, 209 dietary supplement cookie packs, and 45,521 packs, boxes, or granules, more or less, of an article of food, specifically various herbal supplement capsules, tablets, cookies, and teas. (kp, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 8/1/2019 at 1:30 p.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 7/25/2019. Mailed notice (rj, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 6/13/2019. Mailed notice. (kp, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, )
June 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Ernest Yi Ling as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff United States of America (Ling, Ernest)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem filed by United States of America; (Ling, Ernest)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ling, Ernest)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 286,161 bottles, 209 dietary supplement cookie packs, and 45,521 packs, boxes, or granules, more or less, of an article of food, specifically various herbal supplement capsules, tablets, cookies, and teas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 286,161 bottles, 209 dietary supplement cookie packs, and 45,521 packs, boxes, or granules, more or less, of an article of food, specifically various herbal supplement capsules, tablets, cookies, and
Represented By: Robert R. Benjamin
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenberg
Represented By: Melanie Elysia Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ernest Yi Ling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Life Rising Corporation
Represented By: Robert R. Benjamin
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenberg
Represented By: Melanie Elysia Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?