Sheaffer v. Glendale Nissan, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Sheaffer
Defendant: Glendale Nissan, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03899
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Glendale Nissan, Inc. to dismiss Count V and Count VII of Complaint (Pall, Elizabeth)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Glendale Nissan, Inc.(Pall, Elizabeth)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Status hearing held. As stated on the record, Defendant to answer and file motion to dismiss by 8/8/2019. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss shall be filed by 9/5/2019; reply to be filed by 9/19/2019. Discovery schedule: MIDP is due by 9/6/2019; written discovery to issue by 9/20/2019; final supplementation of MIDP is due by 2/28/2020; fact discovery closes on 3/27/2020. Status hearing set for 12/19/2019 at 9:30 a.m. for ruling on motion to dismiss and to report on status of settlement and discovery. Mailed notice (mw, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Robert Sheaffer (White, Ethan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Defendant's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #8 is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading is due by 8/2/19. Mailed notice (rj, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Glendale Nissan, Inc. by Ira M. Levin (Levin, Ira)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth Meyer Pall for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #8 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 7/2/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Pall, Elizabeth)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Glendale Nissan, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Pall, Elizabeth)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Glendale Nissan, Inc. by Elizabeth Meyer Pall (Pall, Elizabeth)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Sheaffer as to Glendale Nissan, Inc. on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (White, Ethan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 8/1/2019 at 1:30 p.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 7/25/2019. Mailed notice (rj, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (rp, )
June 11, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Glendale Nissan, Inc. (kb, )
June 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Robert Sheaffer by Ethan Emery White (White, Ethan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (White, Ethan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Robert Sheaffer; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15915949.(White, Ethan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheaffer v. Glendale Nissan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glendale Nissan, Inc.
Represented By: Ira M. Levin
Represented By: Elizabeth Meyer Pall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sheaffer
Represented By: Ethan Emery White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?