Laborers' Pension Fund et al v. Roy Zenere Trucking and Excavating, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus, Laborers' Pension Fund and Laborers' Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Department of the Construction and General Laborers' District Council of Chicago and Vicinity
Defendant: Roy Zenere Trucking and Excavating, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03916
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held on 8/7/2019 and continued to 10/8/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
July 14, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court sets the case for an initial status hearing pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(a) & (c) on 8/7/2019 at 9:30 a.m. and directs plaintiff's attorney to advise each defendant or its counsel of record in writing of the status hearing date. (mk)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Catherine Wenskus, Laborers' Pension Fund, The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Department of the Construction and General Laborers' District Council of Chicago and Vicinity as to Roy Zenere Trucking and Excavating, Inc. on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Carollo, Amy)
June 12, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Roy Zenere Trucking and Excavating, Inc. (pj, )
June 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Laborers' Pension Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Department of the Construction and General Laborers' District Council of Chicago and Vicinity, The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus by Patrick T. Wallace (Wallace, Patrick)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Laborers' Pension Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Department of the Construction and General Laborers' District Council of Chicago and Vicinity, The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus by Katherine C.V. Mosenson (Mosenson, Katherine)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Laborers' Pension Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Department of the Construction and General Laborers' District Council of Chicago and Vicinity, The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus by Sara Stewart Schumann (Schumann, Sara)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Laborers' Pension Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Department of the Construction and General Laborers' District Council of Chicago and Vicinity, The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus by G Ryan Liska (Liska, G)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Laborers' Pension Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Department of the Construction and General Laborers' District Council of Chicago and Vicinity, The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Catherine Wenskus by Amy Nicole Carollo (Carollo, Amy)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Carollo, Amy)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Catherine Wenskus, Laborers' Pension Fund, The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund, Laborers' Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Department of the Construction and General Laborers' District Council of Chicago and Vicinity; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15918004.(Carollo, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laborers' Pension Fund et al v. Roy Zenere Trucking and Excavating, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Chicago Laborers' District Council Retiree Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Katherine C.V. Mosenson
Represented By: Sara Stewart Schumann
Represented By: G Ryan Liska
Represented By: Patrick T. Wallace
Represented By: Amy Nicole Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Wenskus
Represented By: Katherine C.V. Mosenson
Represented By: Sara Stewart Schumann
Represented By: G Ryan Liska
Represented By: Patrick T. Wallace
Represented By: Amy Nicole Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers' Pension Fund
Represented By: Katherine C.V. Mosenson
Represented By: Sara Stewart Schumann
Represented By: G Ryan Liska
Represented By: Patrick T. Wallace
Represented By: Amy Nicole Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers' Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Fund of the Health and Welfare Department of the Construction and General Laborers' District Council of Chicago and Vicinity
Represented By: Katherine C.V. Mosenson
Represented By: Sara Stewart Schumann
Represented By: G Ryan Liska
Represented By: Patrick T. Wallace
Represented By: Amy Nicole Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Zenere Trucking and Excavating, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?