Boyd v. DuPage Habitat for Humanity
Plaintiff: Susan Boyd
Defendant: DuPage Habitat for Humanity
Case Number: 1:2019cv03917
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendant's agreed motion for extension of time to 9/9/2019 to answer or otherwise plead #7 is granted. Joint status report is to be filed by by 9/19/2019. Status hearing set for 9/23/2019 at 09:00 AM. No appearance is required on 8/5/2019. Mailed notice (srn, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Kimberly Anne Ross for presentment of extension of time #7 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/5/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Ross, Kimberly)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant DuPage Habitat for Humanity for extension of time Agreed (Ross, Kimberly)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DuPage Habitat for Humanity by Kimberly Anne Ross (Ross, Kimberly)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DuPage Habitat for Humanity by Becky Lynn Kalas (Kalas, Becky)
June 12, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant DuPage Habitat for Humanity (pj, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (tt, )
June 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Susan Boyd by Michael T. Smith (Smith, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Susan Boyd; Y. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15918196. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. DuPage Habitat for Humanity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Boyd
Represented By: Michael T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DuPage Habitat for Humanity
Represented By: Becky Lynn Kalas
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?