Gonzalez v. Securitas
Plaintiff: Eddien Enrique Gonzalez
Defendant: Securitas
Case Number: 1:2019cv03939
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Although Plaintiff was warned on June 24, 2019 (Dkt. # 7) that failure to pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis by July 3, 2019 would lead to his case being terminated, Plaintiff has not complied with the Court's order. Accordingly, Plaintiff's complaint will not be filed on the electronic docket and this case is terminated, All pending motions are denied as moot. Plaintiff shall not appear on July 16, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (is, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Eddien Enrique Gonzalez for presentment of statement #10 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 7/16/2019 at 09:30 AM. (mma, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Correction regarding statement #9 . (mma, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT by Eddien Enrique Gonzalez. (mma, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT by Eddien Enrique Gonzalez. (mma, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Plaintiff has filed a notice of motion #6 for Thursday, June 27, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. The notice of motion is stricken for several reasons. First, Plaintiff has not paid the filing fee or filed a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, so his complaint has not yet been filed on the Court's electronic docket. Second, no motion is attached to the notice of motion, so there is nothing for the Court to consider or rule on. Third, the defendant named on the notice of motion is different from the defendant named in the complaint; thus, it appears that Plaintiff has filed the notice of motion in the wrong case. Plaintiff shall not appear on Thursday, June 27, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. as there is nothing properly set before the Court. Mailed notice (is, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Plaintiff has filed a complaint alleging that he was not hired by Defendant because of his age and race. Plaintiff, however, has not paid the filing fee or filed an application to proceed without paying the filing fee (i.e., in forma pauperis or IFP). If Plaintiff does not pay the filing fee or file an IFP application by July 3, 2019, the complaint will not be filed on the electronic docket and the case will be terminated. The Court advises Plaintiff that "[t]o file a complaint under... Title VII [or the Age Discrimination in Employment Act], a plaintiff must first file a written charge of discrimination with the EEOC and then file h[is] lawsuit within 90 days after receiving the EEOC's right to sue letter." Mehrberg v. Dep't of Commerce & Econ. Opportunity, No. 18 C 02032, 2019 WL 2473827, at *2 (N.D. Ill. June 13, 2019) (citing 42 U.S.C. 2000e-5; 42 U.S.C. 12117(a) (incorporating 2000e-5); 29 U.S.C. 626). Mailed notice (is, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Eddien Enrique Gonzalez before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 6/27/2019 at 09:30 AM. (mma, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion by Eddien Enrique Gonzalez before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 6/25/2019 at 09:30 AM. (mma, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT by Eddien Enrique Gonzalez. (mma, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION by Plaintiff Eddien Enrique Gonzalez for attorney representation. (mma, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (mma, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Eddien Enrique Gonzalez. (mma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Securitas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securitas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddien Enrique Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?